|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/04/1927 | 30/04/1927 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1927 | 22/11/1927 | 88 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1929 | 28/05/1929 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1931 | 20/06/1931 | 44 days | General | Bolton superheater removed |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1934 | 10/02/1934 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1936 | 03/07/1936 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 118 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1938 | 12/05/1938 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2113 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1940 | 12/10/1940 | 83 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1943 | 01/05/1943 | 112 days | General | Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1943 | 31/05/1943 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1944 | 06/01/1945 | 32 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 03/03/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 91 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4717 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1948 | 28/02/1948 | 38 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4717 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2945 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1949 | 07/05/1949 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 23/11/1951 | 17/01/1952 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27689 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27803 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1956 | 12/01/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27577 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1958 | 31/05/1958 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | Not repaired |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/03/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1270 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1352 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
21/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/04/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927. | ||
27/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 22/11/1927. | ||
13/12/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to New Holland (?) | ||
06/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
10/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
26/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1929. Dep: 28/05/1929. | ||
08/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. Work undertaken: Bolton superheater removed |
||
19/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1936. Dep: 03/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 118 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
11/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1938. Dep: 12/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2113 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
13/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. | ||
22/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940. | ||
05/04/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
10/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1943. Dep: 31/05/1943. | ||
06/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945. | ||
03/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4717 |
||
22/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1948. Dep: 28/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4717 |
||
05/02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64717 | ||
19/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2945 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949. | ||
23/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1951. Dep: 17/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27689 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27803 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1956. Dep: 12/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27577 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1958. Dep: 31/05/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
02/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64717 from Gorton (9G) | ||
09/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |