|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1929 | 06/09/1929 | 42 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1931 | 19/09/1931 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2110 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1932 | 03/11/1932 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1933 | 09/12/1933 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 2114 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1935 | 19/09/1935 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1940 | 06/07/1940 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1942 | 19/12/1942 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1945 | 11/08/1945 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1948 | 08/03/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 4933 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4718 |
||
Derby Works | 26/10/1950 | 08/12/1950 | 44 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64718 |
||
Derby Works | 12/09/1952 | 24/10/1952 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27725 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 30/10/1952 | 18/11/1952 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1955 | 30/07/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27841 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1958 | 26/04/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 25802 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1959 | 08/08/1959 | 8 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1961 | 1 day | W | Not repaired |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/04/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1496 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1353 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
27/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 06/09/1929. | ||
02/07/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
08/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
13/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1931. Dep: 19/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2110 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1932. Dep: 03/11/1932. | ||
23/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2114 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1935. Dep: 19/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
13/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
04/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. | ||
27/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4718 | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1948. Dep: 08/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4933 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4718 |
||
26/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1950. Dep: 08/12/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64718 |
||
12/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27725 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/10/1952. Dep: 18/11/1952. | ||
18/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27841 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25802 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/08/1959. Dep: 08/08/1959. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/03/1961 | Works Visit | |||
10/02/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64718 from Gorton (9G) | ||
03/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |