Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 192 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4360 Week
» 19474 Month
» 322664 Year
» 1544229 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1497 on 14/04/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4719   01/09/1946
British Railways 64719   25/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 14/04/1927 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Fri 23/11/1962 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping During 06/1963
Service Life 35 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 14/04/1927
LIV Brunswick on 23/04/1927
GOR Gorton on 20/05/1929
LIV Brunswick on 29/11/1929
GOR Gorton on 30/03/1931
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 03/03/1937
GOR Gorton on 05/01/1938
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 27/10/1939
GOR Gorton on 16/11/1941
ANN Annesley on 30/10/1943
CLK Colwick on 30/03/1947
35C Spital Bridge on 05/10/1952
41A Sheffield Darnall on 07/12/1958
51F West Auckland on 11/09/1960
56B Ardsley on 17/06/1962
   Withdrawn on 23/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 30/03/1947
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 27/12/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 91NE   4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 07/07/1962
WDN   on 23/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
14/04/1927 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
12/03/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2191)
14/07/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8020)
05/09/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2277)
29/04/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8026)
19/09/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2772)
28/04/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2698)
28/04/1945 Steam Reverse Removed
28/04/1945 Screw Reverse fitted
19/12/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1917)
25/03/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1352)
20/12/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27685)
09/10/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27675)
14/12/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27881)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 17/09/1929 04/10/1929 18 days General  
Gorton Works 16/02/1932 12/03/1932 26 days General
Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1934 14/07/1934 20 days General
Boiler number 8020 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1936 05/09/1936 20 days General
Boiler number 2277 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1939 29/04/1939 32 days General
Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1942 19/09/1942 56 days General
Boiler number 2772 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1945 28/04/1945 53 days General
Boiler number 2698 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1946 30/11/1946 144 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4719
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1947 19/12/1947 64 days General
Boiler number 1917 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1950 25/03/1950 48 days General
Boiler number E1352 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64719
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1950 01/04/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 29/10/1951 20/12/1951 53 days General
Boiler number 27685 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 30/08/1954 09/10/1954 41 days General
Boiler number 27675 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1957 14/12/1957 45 days General
Boiler number 27881 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1957 23/12/1957 3 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/04/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1497
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
23/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
20/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1929. Dep: 04/10/1929.    
29/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
30/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1932. Dep: 12/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97)
   
25/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8020 (Diagram 97)
   
17/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2277 (Diagram 97)
   
03/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
05/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97)
   
27/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
16/11/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2772 (Diagram 97)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
07/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2698 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
   
10/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4719
   
30/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1947. Dep: 19/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1917 (Diagram 97)
   
06/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1950. Dep: 25/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E1352 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64719
   
31/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1950. Dep: 01/04/1950.    
29/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1951. Dep: 20/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27685 (Diagram 97)
   
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
30/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27675 (Diagram 97)
   
31/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27881 (Diagram 97)
   
21/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/12/1957. Dep: 23/12/1957.    
07/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
11/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
17/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
23/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64719 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev