Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 215 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4383 Week
» 19497 Month
» 322687 Year
» 1544252 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1498 on 28/04/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4720   28/07/1946
British Railways 64720   21/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 28/04/1927 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Fri 08/09/1961 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping During 10/1961
Service Life 34 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 28/04/1927
MAR March on 02/07/1930
ARD Ardsley on 06/08/1930
GOR Gorton on 19/08/1930
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 05/01/1938
GOR Gorton on 03/06/1938
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 11/10/1938
GOR Gorton on 29/08/1939
ANN Annesley on 30/10/1943
CLK Colwick on 30/03/1947
37A Ardsley on 20/05/1951
   Withdrawn on 08/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 30/03/1947
ALLOC 37A Ardsley w/e 26/05/1951
WDN   on 08/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/04/1927 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1923)
31/12/1931 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 826)
01/12/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2184)
20/06/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1921)
06/11/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2102)
30/11/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2123)
30/11/1940 Screw Reverse fitted
30/11/1940 Steam Reverse Removed
13/10/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8585)
21/11/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4929)
21/01/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4984)
18/12/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27686)
23/08/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 25842)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 18/09/1929 17/10/1929 30 days General  
Gorton Works 02/12/1931 31/12/1931 30 days General
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1933 01/12/1933 19 days General
Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1935 20/06/1935 14 days General
Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1937 06/11/1937 20 days General
Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 20/09/1938 29/09/1938 10 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/10/1940 30/11/1940 33 days General
Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1942 23/01/1943 123 days General  
Gorton Works 18/07/1945 13/10/1945 88 days General
Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1947 21/11/1947 73 days General
Boiler number 4929 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1949 21/01/1950 60 days General
Boiler number 4984 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64720
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1954 29/09/1954 50 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 23/01/1956 17/03/1956 55 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/03/1957 30/03/1957 24 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 26/06/1958 23/08/1958 59 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 25842 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/04/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1498
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
18/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1929. Dep: 17/10/1929.    
02/07/1930 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
06/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
19/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97)
   
13/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1933. Dep: 01/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97)
   
07/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1935. Dep: 20/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97)
   
18/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97)
   
05/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
03/06/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1938. Dep: 29/09/1938.    
11/10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
29/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
   
23/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 23/01/1943.    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
18/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97)
   
28/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4720    
30/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1947. Dep: 21/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4929 (Diagram 97)
   
23/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1949. Dep: 21/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4984 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64720
   
20/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
18/12/1951 Modification Diagram 97 number 27686 boiler fitted    
11/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/08/1954. Dep: 29/09/1954.    
23/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956.    
07/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957.    
26/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
Boiler number 25842 (Diagram 97)
   
08/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64720 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev