|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1929 | 17/10/1929 | 30 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1931 | 31/12/1931 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1933 | 01/12/1933 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1935 | 20/06/1935 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1937 | 06/11/1937 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1938 | 29/09/1938 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1942 | 23/01/1943 | 123 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1945 | 13/10/1945 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1947 | 21/11/1947 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 4929 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1949 | 21/01/1950 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 4984 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64720 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1954 | 29/09/1954 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1956 | 17/03/1956 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1957 | 30/03/1957 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1958 | 23/08/1958 | 59 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 25842 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/04/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1498 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1355 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1929. Dep: 17/10/1929. | ||
02/07/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
06/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1933. Dep: 01/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1935. Dep: 20/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
03/06/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1938. Dep: 29/09/1938. | ||
11/10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
29/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
23/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 23/01/1943. | ||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
18/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4720 | ||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
10/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1947. Dep: 21/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4929 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1949. Dep: 21/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4984 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64720 |
||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
18/12/1951 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 27686 boiler fitted | ||
11/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/08/1954. Dep: 29/09/1954. | ||
23/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956. | ||
07/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957. | ||
26/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 25842 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64720 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
10/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |