Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 234 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4402 Week
» 19516 Month
» 322706 Year
» 1544271 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1233 on 03/05/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4721   07/04/1946
British Railways 64721   18/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 03/05/1927 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 15/02/1960 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 03/05/1927
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 16/10/1933
GOR Gorton on 16/08/1935
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 03/06/1938
GOR Gorton on 27/10/1939
DON Doncaster on 02/05/1945
   Withdrawn on 15/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 15/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/05/1927 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 827)
06/06/1931 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2184)
05/08/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8021)
02/10/1935 Steam Reverse Removed
02/10/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2641)
02/10/1935 Screw Reverse fitted
19/03/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2302)
24/02/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2218)
06/01/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8026)
28/09/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4925)
29/05/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27778)
03/03/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27779)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 28/05/1929 25/06/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 08/05/1931 06/06/1931 30 days General
Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1933 05/08/1933 20 days General
Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 28/08/1935 02/10/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 2641 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1936 20/06/1936 19 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 28/02/1938 19/03/1938 20 days General
Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1939 25/03/1939 18 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/12/1939 24/02/1940 71 days General
Boiler number 2218 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1942 06/06/1942 84 days General  
Gorton Works 28/06/1942 05/07/1942 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/11/1944 06/01/1945 49 days General
Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1947 28/09/1947 226 days General
Boiler number 4925 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1950 18/10/1950 78 days Light Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64721
 
Derby Works 17/03/1951 24/05/1951 69 days Heavy Casual  
Stratford Works 29/03/1953 29/05/1953 62 days General
Boiler number 27778 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 01/01/1956 03/03/1956 63 days General
Boiler number 27779 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 21/10/50, 40405 5C, 40505 71H, 40522 8E, 40743 20A, 41123 7A, 42184 16A, 42332 9B, 42374 33A, 42521 33D, 43212 18C, 44166 17B, 4267 22A, 44524 21A, 7096 1A, 7441 15C, 47469 23C, 20155 16A, 23006 3E, 58247 17C, (W) 2107 84F, 64834 32B, 64958 30A. The most interesting items are 40743 for intermediate repair, and 20155 (the last 2-4-0-Midland-for special examination which usually means condemnation).
New construction: 42054 on trials 18/10, 42055/6 completed, 42057-60 in various stages; 12078 in paint shop 18/10, 12079-81 complete, 12082-4 in various stages.
Ex works 40532/655, 41004/67, 42509/22, 42325, 47410, 64721/37/57, 64956/80 (W/E 18/10), 40584, 41001/60, 41153/65/81, 41833, 42345, 43586, 43992, 47340, 47674, 64883 (W/E 25/10).
Cut up: 15-18/10/50. Nos. 1251 an 1406 (old Nos.). No. 58236, in paint shop 18/10 with R/T boiler.
Stored: 407, 40418/513/556/632, 43342/64, 3368, 43482, 43200. (25/10).
SLS/195012
14/04/1951 Derby Works By mid-April, 73000 was finished, painted grey and running trials. Engines from other regions entering works were 42305 (87K), 42513 (33A), 64759 (36E), 64721 (36A), 42514 (33A), 64726 (32A), 64788 (30F). Position of engines stored not materially altered. SLS/195105

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/05/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1233
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
28/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1929. Dep: 25/06/1929.    
08/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97)
   
17/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97)
   
16/10/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
16/08/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1935. Dep: 02/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2641 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
   
02/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936.    
28/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97)
   
03/06/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
08/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939.    
27/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 24/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2218 (Diagram 97)
   
15/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1942. Dep: 06/06/1942.    
28/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/06/1942. Dep: 05/07/1942.    
19/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97)
   
02/05/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4721    
15/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 28/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4925 (Diagram 97)
   
02/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/08/1950. Dep: 18/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64721
   
17/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1951. Dep: 24/05/1951.    
29/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1953. Dep: 29/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27778 (Diagram 97)
   
01/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1956. Dep: 03/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27779 (Diagram 97)
   
15/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64721 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev