Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 179 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 179 Week
» 14083 Month
» 322064 Year
» 1206445 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1263   10/05/1927
LNER (1946) 4723   07/04/1946
BR (Tmp) E4723   22/01/1948
BR 64723   29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 10/05/1927 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Fri 24/03/1961 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 04/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) 10/05/1927
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 16/11/1941
38A Colwick 11/03/1951
9F Heaton Mersey 05/08/1951
38A Colwick 12/10/1952
35C Spital Bridge 13/10/1952
40A Lincoln 07/12/1958
36A Doncaster 01/03/1959
   Withdrawn 24/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 38A Colwick m/e 31/03/1951
LOAN 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   24/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/05/1927 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
12/08/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8018)
05/05/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2218)
23/05/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2112)
29/07/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2309)
29/07/1944 Steam Reverse Removed
29/07/1944 Screw Reverse fitted
22/01/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number RS120)
25/02/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4913)
05/12/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27878)
06/04/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 25837)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 16/01/1929 21/02/1929 37 days General  
Gorton Works 08/07/1930 16/08/1930 40 days General  
Gorton Works 25/07/1932 12/08/1932 19 days General
Boiler number 8018 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1934 05/05/1934 25 days General
Boiler number 2218 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1936 23/05/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 2112 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 22/09/1938 27/10/1938 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/11/1938 16/11/1938 2 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 10/07/1941 18/09/1941 71 days General  
Gorton Works 17/05/1942 10/06/1942 25 days Light Repair
Tender on;y
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1944 29/07/1944 56 days General
Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1946 18/05/1946 56 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4723
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1947 22/01/1948 118 days General
Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E4723
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1949 12/03/1949 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 03/01/1950 25/02/1950 54 days General
Boiler number 4913 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1950 22/04/1950 17 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/10/1950 11/11/1950 33 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 27/10/1953 05/12/1953 40 days General
Boiler number 27878 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1957 06/04/1957 38 days General
Boiler number 25837 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1957 10/04/1957 2 days Unclassified
Tender only
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/05/1927 To Service To service as LNER Number 1263
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
16/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1929. Dep: 21/02/1929.    
08/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930.    
25/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1932. Dep: 12/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8018 (Diagram 97)
   
11/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2218 (Diagram 97)
   
02/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2112 (Diagram 97)
   
22/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1938. Dep: 27/10/1938.    
15/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1938. Dep: 16/11/1938.    
10/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1941. Dep: 18/09/1941.    
16/11/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
17/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1942. Dep: 10/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender on;y
   
04/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
   
24/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4723
   
27/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1947. Dep: 22/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E4723
   
29/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64723    
12/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/02/1949. Dep: 12/03/1949.    
03/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1950. Dep: 25/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4913 (Diagram 97)
   
06/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/04/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950.    
10/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950.    
11/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
05/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
12/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
13/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
27/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27878 (Diagram 97)
   
28/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 25837 (Diagram 97)
   
09/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1957. Dep: 10/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
07/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
01/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
24/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64723 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev