Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1259   10/05/1927
LNER (1946) 4724   07/06/1946
BR 64724   31/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 10/05/1927 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal Mon 08/02/1960 off Ipswich (32B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) 10/05/1927
MAR March 19/03/1936
CAR Carlisle Canal 08/06/1938
MAR March 05/09/1938
CAM Cambridge 12/12/1940
MAR March 09/03/1941
NOR Norwich Thorpe 29/08/1943
IPS Ipswich 07/11/1943
32A Norwich Thorpe 30/04/1950
32C Lowestoft 18/10/1953
32A Norwich Thorpe 24/01/1954
32B Ipswich 09/10/1955
   Withdrawn 08/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe m/e 30/04/1950
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 05/11/1955
WDN   08/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/05/1927 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1928)
24/08/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8010)
19/03/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2138)
19/03/1936 Steam Reverse Removed
19/03/1936 Screw Reverse fitted
14/05/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2093)
23/08/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2220)
17/08/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27673)
02/04/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27820)
07/06/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27685)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 04/11/1929 18/01/1930 76 days General  
Gorton Works 02/07/1932 24/08/1932 54 days General
Boiler number 8010 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 10/01/1936 19/03/1936 70 days General
Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1938 14/05/1938 63 days General
Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1940 23/08/1940 48 days General
Boiler number 2220 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 29/01/1943 12/09/1943 227 days General  
Stratford Works 12/11/1944 29/11/1944 18 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 28/03/1946 12/06/1946 77 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4724
 
Doncaster Works 23/05/1948 01/08/1948 71 days General
Renumbered to BR 64724
 
Derby Works 14/06/1951 17/08/1951 65 days General
Boiler number 27673 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 14/02/1954 02/04/1954 48 days General
Boiler number 27820 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 08/03/1956 28/07/1956 143 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 20/06/1956 28/06/1956 9 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 28/04/1957 07/06/1957 41 days General
Boiler number 27685 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/05/1927 To Service To service as LNER Number 1259
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
04/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930.    
02/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 24/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8010 (Diagram 97)
   
10/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1936. Dep: 19/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
   
19/03/1936 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
13/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97)
   
08/06/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
05/09/1938 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
07/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1940. Dep: 23/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2220 (Diagram 97)
   
12/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
09/03/1941 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
29/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1943. Dep: 12/09/1943.    
29/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
07/11/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
12/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1944. Dep: 29/11/1944.    
28/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1946. Dep: 12/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4724
   
23/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1948. Dep: 01/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64724
   
30/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
14/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1951. Dep: 17/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27673 (Diagram 97)
   
18/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
24/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
14/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27820 (Diagram 97)
   
09/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
08/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1956. Dep: 28/07/1956.    
20/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1956. Dep: 28/06/1956.    
28/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27685 (Diagram 97)
   
08/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64724 from Ipswich (32B)    

prev prev