|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1929 | 04/07/1929 | 30 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1931 | 10/10/1931 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 8015 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1934 | 08/03/1934 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 1917 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1936 | 28/05/1936 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1938 | 07/12/1938 | 28 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1941 | 26/10/1941 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 2318 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 16 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 19/11/1946 | 13/02/1947 | 87 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1949 | 09/04/1949 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 4968 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64728 |
||
Derby Works | 12/01/1951 | 14/03/1951 | 62 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 19/03/1951 | 21/03/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 14/05/1953 | 04/07/1953 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27784 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1956 | 18/08/1956 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 27760 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the second half of January new construction comprised some work on Nos. 73000/1, the cylinders of the former being positioned. No. 10100 has been outside the diesel shop for some days. Condemned locos. in the Works yard: 40370, 41012, 41824 (from W.R.), also the N.L. Crane 58865. No. 22853 was still in Works, not cut up, on 26/1. In store near the station: 43429 (17C), and 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361 (17A), all 17A. Engines from other Regions under repair: 42328, 42506/23, 58043 (33A), 42394 (87K), 44518 (35C), 64728 (40A), 64751, 64911 (37A), 64987 (36C). Most engines now leave shops with the B.R. emblem, but 42371 an 47473 have come off lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS, while tenders so lettered are attached to 43757, 44576 an 58265. Engines off shops with tanks or tenders lettered L.M.S. are 42335, 41101, 43395, 44002/15: apparently Derby has a lingering affection for this lettering, which became obsolete three years ago!! W2043 has come off without emblem, but with W prefix under the numberplate. No. 58071, lined with emblem, is freshly out still with round-topped firebox. Several J.39 class have come off shops, 64793, 64910/79 (repainted with emblem) and 64714 (renumbered-with emblem-but not repainted). Un-renumbered engines in shops include 326 (20A), 580 (27D), 7295 (12A), 7339 (11A), 7391 (12A). No. 326 is the last of the S. & D.J. engines to get its B.R. number, which will be its fourth: originally No. 69, it became 43 in 1928, and 326 in March 1930. Latterly it has been working in the Leeds area. | SLS/195103 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/05/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1272 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1363 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
05/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1929. Dep: 04/07/1929. | ||
04/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
26/07/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
07/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8015 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1934. Dep: 08/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1917 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1936. Dep: 28/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
10/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1938. Dep: 07/12/1938. | ||
24/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1941. Dep: 26/10/1941. | ||
12/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2318 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
22/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4728 | ||
19/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1946. Dep: 13/02/1947. | ||
08/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. | ||
22/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4968 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64728 |
||
12/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/01/1951. Dep: 14/03/1951. | ||
19/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1951. Dep: 21/03/1951. | ||
14/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27784 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27760 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
22/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64728 from Boston (40F) | ||
05/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |