Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 235 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 6469 Month
» 314450 Year
» 1198831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1274   30/05/1927
LNER (1946) 4732   15/05/1946
BR 64732   04/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 30/05/1927 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Fri 25/08/1961 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping During 12/1961
Service Life 34 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) 30/05/1927
GOR Gorton 17/02/1928
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 27/09/1938
GOR Gorton 17/02/1939
13D Northwich 05/12/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall 01/01/1944
BRN Barnsley 27/10/1946
CLK Colwick 27/04/1947
14A Cricklewood East 15/12/1949
30A Stratford 11/03/1951
14A Cricklewood East 01/04/1951
37A Ardsley 16/03/1952
   Withdrawn 25/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BNS   w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC CLK Colwick 27/04/1947
LOAN 14A Cricklewood East 15/12/1949
LOAN 30A Stratford m/e 31/03/1951
LOAN 14A Cricklewood East w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 22/03/1952
WDN   25/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/05/1927 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
26/09/1931 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8013)
16/12/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2129)
09/03/1936 Screw Reverse fitted
09/03/1936 Steam Reverse Removed
09/03/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 826)
13/08/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2138)
05/04/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number RS118)
31/01/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8589)
05/08/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8009)
24/05/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3213)
04/11/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2595)
04/09/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 25813)
04/01/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27838)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 16/02/1929 06/04/1929 50 days General  
Gorton Works 21/08/1931 26/09/1931 37 days General
Boiler number 8013 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1933 16/12/1933 20 days General
Boiler number 2129 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 27/01/1936 09/03/1936 43 days General
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1938 13/08/1938 27 days General
Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1941 05/04/1941 50 days General
Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1941 31/01/1942 34 days Heavy
Boiler number 8589 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1942 28/03/1942 34 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1942 20/06/1942 41 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Doncaster Works 31/01/1943 16/08/1943 198 days Heavy
Fractured frame
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1944 05/08/1944 63 days General
Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1945 24/05/1946 145 days General
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4732
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1947 31/12/1947 77 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 28/08/1949 04/11/1949 69 days General
Boiler number 2595 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64732
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1949 10/11/1949 3 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 28/09/1951 07/11/1951 41 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 03/07/1954 04/09/1954 64 days General
Boiler number 25813 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1957 04/01/1958 36 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 27838 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/05/1927 To Service To service as LNER Number 1274
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
17/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 06/04/1929.    
21/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1931. Dep: 26/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8013 (Diagram 97)
   
27/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2129 (Diagram 97)
   
27/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1936. Dep: 09/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
   
18/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97)
   
27/09/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
17/02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
15/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1941. Dep: 05/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97)
   
29/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/12/1941. Dep: 31/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8589 (Diagram 97)
   
23/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
11/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
31/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/01/1943. Dep: 16/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Fractured frame
   
05/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (13D)    
01/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
04/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97)
   
31/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1945. Dep: 24/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4732
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
16/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947.    
28/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1949. Dep: 04/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2595 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64732
   
08/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1949. Dep: 10/11/1949.    
15/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
11/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
28/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/09/1951. Dep: 07/11/1951.    
16/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
03/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 25813 (Diagram 97)
   
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
30/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1957. Dep: 04/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
Boiler number 27838 (Diagram 97)
   
25/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64732 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev