|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1929 | 21/08/1929 | 26 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1931 | 14/11/1931 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2189 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2097 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1936 | 03/10/1936 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2145 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1938 | 17/12/1938 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1941 | 28/06/1941 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 8020 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/02/1944 | 19/03/1944 | 46 days | General | Boiler number RS122 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 01/11/1946 | 22/02/1947 | 114 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1948 | 03/06/1948 | 29 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64736 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1948 | 05/02/1949 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 05/10/1951 | 13/11/1951 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27680 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 27/03/1952 | 02/05/1952 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 05/03/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1954 | 15/05/1954 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 25811 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1954 | 25/05/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1954 | 31/05/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1954 | 08/06/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27886 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/06/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1282 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1371 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
27/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 21/08/1929. | ||
06/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2189 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2097 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/06/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
04/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2145 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8020 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
03/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1944. Dep: 19/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS122 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. | ||
11/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. | ||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4736 | ||
01/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1946. Dep: 22/02/1947. | ||
06/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1948. Dep: 03/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64736 |
||
21/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1948. Dep: 05/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1951. Dep: 13/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27680 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/03/1952. Dep: 02/05/1952. | ||
05/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953. | ||
25/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25811 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1954. Dep: 25/05/1954. | ||
29/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/05/1954. Dep: 31/05/1954. | ||
03/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1954. Dep: 08/06/1954. | ||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
12/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27886 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
13/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
07/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
10/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64736 from Colwick (40E) |