|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/03/1930 | 03/05/1930 | 39 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1933 | 13/04/1933 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 8007 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1935 | 13/12/1935 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1937 | 04/12/1937 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1937 | 22/12/1937 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/12/1937 | 05/01/1938 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1939 | 30/12/1939 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1942 | 28/02/1942 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2136 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 72 days | General | Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 69 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1947 | 27/09/1947 | 223 days | General | Boiler number 2922 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 37 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 64739 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1950 | 22/07/1950 | 83 days | General | Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1950 | 29/07/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1953 | 27/06/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27765 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1954 | 15/05/1954 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1955 | 02/04/1955 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1956 | 26/05/1956 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27698 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1957 | 29/06/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1958 | 20/12/1958 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27843 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1289 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1374 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
21/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
22/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
07/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
26/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930. | ||
30/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
10/08/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
17/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1933. Dep: 13/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8007 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
01/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1935. Dep: 13/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
08/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1937. Dep: 04/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1937. Dep: 22/12/1937. | ||
27/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/12/1937. Dep: 05/01/1938. | ||
01/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1939. Dep: 30/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1942. Dep: 28/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2136 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
23/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4739 | ||
17/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2922 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64739 |
||
01/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1950. Dep: 22/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1950. Dep: 29/07/1950. | ||
20/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1953. Dep: 27/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27765 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954. | ||
18/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955. | ||
15/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. | ||
11/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1956. Dep: 26/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27698 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/06/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957. | ||
04/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/10/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. | ||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
02/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27843 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64739 from Annesley (16D) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |