Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 781 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4949 Week
» 20063 Month
» 323253 Year
» 1544818 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1290 on 16/07/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4740   05/05/1946
British Railways 64740   03/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 16/07/1927 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping During 12/1962
Service Life 35 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) on 16/07/1927
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 01/02/1936
YK York (North) on 19/06/1938
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 23/08/1938
GOR Gorton on 19/11/1938
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 21/08/1940
GOR Gorton on 30/09/1945
   Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/07/1927 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1960)
10/12/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2294)
30/10/1935 Screw Reverse fitted
30/10/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2312)
30/10/1935 Steam Reverse Removed
26/03/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2641)
18/05/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8008)
14/11/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1350)
03/03/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4908)
07/09/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3210)
03/09/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2109)
23/11/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27682)
10/10/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27722)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 10/01/1930 08/02/1930 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/11/1932 10/12/1932 27 days General
Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 24/09/1935 30/10/1935 37 days General
Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1938 26/03/1938 19 days General
Boiler number 2641 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1940 18/05/1940 43 days General
Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1942 14/11/1942 58 days General
Boiler number E1350 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1942 12/12/1942 18 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 24/12/1944 03/03/1945 70 days General
Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1946 31/07/1946 74 days General  
Gorton Works 25/05/1947 07/09/1947 106 days General
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1949 03/09/1949 49 days General
Boiler number 2109 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64740
 
Derby Works 10/10/1951 23/11/1951 45 days General
Boiler number 27682 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1953 31/10/1953 71 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 28/08/1956 10/10/1956 44 days General
Boiler number 27722 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1959 12/03/1959 9 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 09/10/1959 10/11/1959 33 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 18/01/1960 22/01/1960 5 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/07/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1290
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
10/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1930. Dep: 08/02/1930.    
14/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97)
   
24/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1935. Dep: 30/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
   
01/02/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
08/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2641 (Diagram 97)
   
19/06/1938 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
23/08/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
19/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97)
   
21/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
18/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E1350 (Diagram 97)
   
25/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942.    
24/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1944. Dep: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97)
   
30/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4740    
19/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1946. Dep: 31/07/1946.    
25/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1947. Dep: 07/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 97)
   
17/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1949. Dep: 03/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2109 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64740
   
10/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1951. Dep: 23/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27682 (Diagram 97)
   
22/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/08/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953.    
28/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1956. Dep: 10/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27722 (Diagram 97)
   
04/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/03/1959. Dep: 12/03/1959.    
09/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1959. Dep: 10/11/1959.    
18/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1960. Dep: 22/01/1960.    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64740 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev