Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 815 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4983 Week
» 20097 Month
» 323287 Year
» 1544852 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1295 on 16/07/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4741   18/05/1946
British Railways 64741   20/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 16/07/1927 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal Mon 11/07/1960
Scrapping During 07/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) on 16/07/1927
STR Stratford on 08/10/1927
CLK Colwick on 30/05/1933
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 10/04/1934
GOR Gorton on 30/12/1935
LIV Brunswick on 08/02/1937
GOR Gorton on 05/11/1938
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 17/02/1939
GOR Gorton on 21/08/1940
BID Bidston on 03/01/1950
GOR Gorton on 10/01/1950
40A Lincoln on 26/09/1954
38A Colwick on 10/07/1955
40F Boston on 09/11/1958
40A Lincoln m/e 03/1959
   Withdrawn on 11/07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN GOR Gorton on 10/01/1950
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 40F Boston 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   w/e 11/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/07/1927 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1962)
02/07/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8008)
04/08/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8012)
21/11/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8020)
04/02/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2106)
22/07/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2138)
22/07/1944 Screw Reverse fitted
22/07/1944 Steam Reverse Removed
22/02/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2208)
20/08/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3203)
28/04/1952 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27694)
16/09/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27833)
15/06/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 25801)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/04/1930 17/05/1930 41 days General  
Gorton Works 06/06/1932 02/07/1932 27 days General
Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1934 04/08/1934 16 days General
Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1936 21/11/1936 17 days General
Boiler number 8020 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1939 04/02/1939 18 days General
Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 16/08/1941 16/11/1941 93 days General  
Gorton Works 13/05/1944 22/07/1944 71 days General
Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1947 25/04/1947 14 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 26/08/1947 22/02/1947 -184 days General  
Gorton Works 21/06/1949 20/08/1949 61 days General
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64741
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1949 01/10/1949 16 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/10/1949 29/10/1949 18 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 19/03/1952 28/04/1952 41 days General
Boiler number 27694 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1954 16/09/1954 74 days General
Boiler number 27833 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1957 02/03/1957 52 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 02/05/1957 15/06/1957 45 days General
Boiler number 25801 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1957 27/06/1957 10 days Unclassified
Not repaired
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/07/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1295
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
08/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
07/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930.    
06/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1932. Dep: 02/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97)
   
30/05/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/04/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
20/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97)
   
30/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1936. Dep: 21/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8020 (Diagram 97)
   
08/02/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
05/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97)
   
17/02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
21/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1941. Dep: 16/11/1941.    
13/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
   
18/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4741    
22/02/1947 Modification Diagram 97 number 2208 boiler fitted    
12/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1947. Dep: 25/04/1947.    
26/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947.    
21/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64741
   
16/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949.    
12/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949.    
03/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bidston (BID)    
10/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 28/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27694 (Diagram 97)
   
05/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1954. Dep: 16/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27833 (Diagram 97)
   
26/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
10/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
10/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957.    
02/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1957. Dep: 15/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 25801 (Diagram 97)
   
18/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1957. Dep: 27/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
   
09/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
11/07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64741    

prev prev