|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1930 | 10/04/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1932 | 30/04/1932 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 8011 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1934 | 14/06/1934 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1936 | 14/11/1936 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 2108 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1939 | 08/04/1939 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 66 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 140 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1947 | 15/02/1947 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1949 | 01/07/1949 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27764 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted Renumbered to BR 64742 |
||
Derby Works | 22/11/1951 | 25/01/1952 | 65 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1953 | 06/06/1953 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1954 | 27/11/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 25814 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1957 | 21/12/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27787 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows.-Nos.1285 9/2. 1286 (11/2), 1287 (13/2), 1288 (16/2), 1289 (18/2), 1290 (20/2), 1291 (24/2), 1292 (25/2), 1293 (27/2), 1294 (1/3), 1295 (3/3), 1296 (5/3), 1297 (10/3), 1298 (11/3), 1299 (12/3), 1300 (15/3), 1301 (17/3), 1302 (23/3) and 1303 (26/3). No. 1287 was the last to appear lettered L.N.E.R. No. 1288 and onwards have appeared with 'British Railways' on the tender in 9' high letters and the prefix letter 'E' in front of the number both on the cab side and the buffer beam; all lettering and numbering being in plain yellow Gill Sans style. This week's (3/4) deliveries are expected to appear as 61304 onwards. Further Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1285-93 (26186-94/47) and 1294- 1303 (26195-204/48), and up to No. 1303 all have appeared with the small cast L.N.E.R. number plates on the cab sides, dated 1947 and not pre fixed 'E.' | SLS/194805 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/08/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1296 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1377 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
08/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
25/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend on Sea (?) | ||
01/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
06/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1930. Dep: 10/04/1930. | ||
31/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8011 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/05/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
28/03/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
22/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1934. Dep: 14/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2108 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1939. Dep: 08/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
05/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
16/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4742 | ||
01/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. | ||
09/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947. | ||
09/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1949. Dep: 01/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27764 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted Renumbered to BR 64742 |
||
22/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/11/1951. Dep: 25/01/1952. | ||
07/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953. | ||
11/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954. | ||
22/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1954. Dep: 24/04/1954. | ||
18/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 27/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25814 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1957. Dep: 21/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27787 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
21/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64742 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |