Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 175 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4343 Week
» 19457 Month
» 322647 Year
» 1544212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2692 on 18/07/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4745   10/01/1947
British Railways 64745   12/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 18/07/1928 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/11/1961 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping During 03/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 18/07/1928
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 16/08/1935
GOR Gorton on 03/03/1937
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 01/07/1937
GOR Gorton on 11/10/1938
LIV Brunswick on 05/11/1938
GOR Gorton on 26/07/1941
   Withdrawn w/e 11/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 11/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/07/1928 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2094)
13/04/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8023)
23/02/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2205)
24/04/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2299)
20/05/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8013)
02/04/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2601)
04/06/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8008)
12/11/1952 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27728)
10/12/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27799)
20/12/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27835)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/03/1931 25/04/1931 37 days General  
Gorton Works 17/03/1933 13/04/1933 28 days General
Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1935 23/02/1935 12 days General
Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1937 24/04/1937 31 days General
Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 22/09/1938 15/10/1938 24 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/07/1941 21/09/1941 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/11/1943 13/11/1943 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/04/1944 20/05/1944 38 days General
Boiler number 8013 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1947 11/06/1947 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 08/09/1947 02/04/1947 -158 days General  
Gorton Works 12/03/1948 12/05/1948 62 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 64745
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1949 04/06/1949 41 days General
Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1949 30/07/1949 3 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 15/10/1950 12/12/1950 59 days Heavy Intermediate  
Derby Works 09/10/1952 12/11/1952 35 days General
Boiler number 27728 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1955 10/12/1955 57 days General
Boiler number 27799 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1956 17/03/1956 8 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1958 20/12/1958 29 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 27835 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/07/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2692
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
20/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1931. Dep: 25/04/1931.    
17/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1933. Dep: 13/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97)
   
12/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97)
   
16/08/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
03/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97)
   
01/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
22/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938.    
11/10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
26/07/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1941. Dep: 21/09/1941.    
06/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943.    
13/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8013 (Diagram 97)
   
10/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 4745    
02/04/1947 Modification Diagram 97 number 2601 boiler fitted    
02/04/1947 Modification Diagram 97 number 27494 boiler fitted    
08/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1947. Dep: 11/06/1947.    
08/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1947. Dep: 02/04/1947.    
12/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/03/1948. Dep: 12/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64745
   
25/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97)
   
28/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949.    
15/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/10/1950. Dep: 12/12/1950.    
09/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 12/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27728 (Diagram 97)
   
15/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27799 (Diagram 97)
   
10/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/03/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
22/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
Boiler number 27835 (Diagram 97)
   
11/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64745 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev