|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/03/1931 | 25/04/1931 | 37 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1933 | 13/04/1933 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1935 | 23/02/1935 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1937 | 24/04/1937 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1938 | 15/10/1938 | 24 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1941 | 21/09/1941 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1943 | 13/11/1943 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1944 | 20/05/1944 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 8013 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1947 | 11/06/1947 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1947 | 02/04/1947 | -158 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1948 | 12/05/1948 | 62 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64745 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1949 | 04/06/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1949 | 30/07/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 15/10/1950 | 12/12/1950 | 59 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 09/10/1952 | 12/11/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27728 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 27799 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1956 | 17/03/1956 | 8 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1958 | 20/12/1958 | 29 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27835 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/07/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2692 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1406 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
20/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1931. Dep: 25/04/1931. | ||
17/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1933. Dep: 13/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
03/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/07/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
22/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938. | ||
11/10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
26/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
27/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1941. Dep: 21/09/1941. | ||
06/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943. | ||
13/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8013 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4745 | ||
02/04/1947 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 2601 boiler fitted | ||
02/04/1947 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 27494 boiler fitted | ||
08/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1947. Dep: 11/06/1947. | ||
08/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1947. Dep: 02/04/1947. | ||
12/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/03/1948. Dep: 12/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64745 |
||
25/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949. | ||
15/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/10/1950. Dep: 12/12/1950. | ||
09/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 12/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27728 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27799 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/03/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
22/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27835 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64745 from Gorton (9G) | ||
03/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |