Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 181 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4349 Week
» 19463 Month
» 322653 Year
» 1544218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2693 on 20/07/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4746   31/10/1946
British Railways 64746   23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 20/07/1928 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 20/02/1961 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 03/1961
Service Life 32 yrs , 7 mths

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 20/07/1928
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 30/12/1935
GOR Gorton on 26/02/1938
NWE New England on 22/09/1938
BOS Boston on 28/09/1938
GRA Grantham on 16/04/1945
NWE New England on 09/02/1947
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 22/01/1950
40E Colwick on 13/03/1960
   Withdrawn on 20/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 28/01/1950
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 19/03/1960
WDN   on 20/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
20/07/1928 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2097)
06/06/1931 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2182)
29/07/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2121)
29/10/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2095)
09/04/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2132)
06/07/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2675)
07/08/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2767)
25/05/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP140)
23/10/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2688)
06/02/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 25809)
23/06/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27755)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/05/1931 06/06/1931 30 days General
Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1933 29/07/1933 23 days General
Boiler number 2121 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 24/09/1935 29/10/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1938 09/04/1938 25 days General
Boiler number 2132 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1940 06/07/1940 37 days General
Boiler number 2675 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1943 07/08/1943 55 days General
Boiler number 2767 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 25/12/1945 25/05/1946 152 days General
Boiler number BP140 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1948 23/10/1948 65 days General
Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64746
 
Derby Works 15/02/1952 24/03/1952 39 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 22/12/1953 06/02/1954 47 days General
Boiler number 25809 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1954 13/02/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 07/05/1956 23/06/1956 48 days General
Boiler number 27755 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/07/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2693
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
08/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97)
   
07/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2121 (Diagram 97)
   
24/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1935. Dep: 29/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97)
   
30/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
26/02/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2132 (Diagram 97)
   
22/09/1938 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
28/09/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
31/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2675 (Diagram 97)
   
14/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2767 (Diagram 97)
   
16/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
25/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1945. Dep: 25/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number BP140 (Diagram 97)
   
31/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4746    
09/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
20/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64746
   
22/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
15/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/02/1952. Dep: 24/03/1952.    
22/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1953. Dep: 06/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 25809 (Diagram 97)
   
09/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1954. Dep: 13/02/1954.    
07/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27755 (Diagram 97)
   
13/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
20/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64746 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev