|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 06/03/1931 | 25/04/1931 | 51 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1933 | 12/08/1933 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1935 | 22/08/1935 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1937 | 29/05/1937 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1939 | 19/08/1939 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 8011 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1941 | 26/12/1941 | 89 days | General | Boiler number 27697 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1943 | 30/10/1943 | 117 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1945 | 02/02/1946 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1948 | 21/08/1948 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 4907 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64747 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1948 | 16/10/1948 | 38 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 12/04/1951 | 24/05/1951 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27664 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 14/01/1952 | 20/02/1952 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1953 | 31/10/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 25803 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1954 | 06/11/1954 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1956 | 29/03/1956 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27593 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1958 | 10/01/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27840 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2694 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1408 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
06/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1931. Dep: 25/04/1931. | ||
05/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
21/06/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1933. Dep: 12/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/11/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
12/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1935. Dep: 22/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1937. Dep: 29/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8011 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 26/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27697 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943. | ||
18/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1945. Dep: 02/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4747 | ||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4907 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64747 |
||
09/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948. | ||
12/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1951. Dep: 24/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27664 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1952. Dep: 20/02/1952. | ||
07/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. | ||
30/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25803 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954. | ||
03/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1956. Dep: 29/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27593 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
28/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1958. Dep: 10/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27840 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
01/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
10/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64747 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |