|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 14/11/1930 | 27/12/1930 | 44 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1931 | 19/12/1931 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1933 | 24/03/1933 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1935 | 11/10/1935 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2113 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1938 | 05/02/1938 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 8019 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1940 | 17/08/1940 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 2132 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1942 | 05/12/1942 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1942 | 18/12/1942 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 70 days | General | Boiler number C1711 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1949 | 05/03/1949 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 4967 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64748 |
||
Derby Works | 19/10/1951 | 12/12/1951 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 27684 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1954 | 10/07/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 25812 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1957 | 02/02/1957 | 29 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27575 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2695 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1409 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1930. Dep: 27/12/1930. | ||
27/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1931. Dep: 19/12/1931. | ||
01/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1933. Dep: 24/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/06/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
14/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1935. Dep: 11/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2113 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1938. Dep: 05/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8019 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
06/10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
02/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2132 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1942. Dep: 18/12/1942. | ||
16/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
17/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1711 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4748 | ||
17/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4967 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64748 |
||
11/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1951. Dep: 12/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27684 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25812 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1957. Dep: 02/02/1957. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27575 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64748 from Gorton (9G) | ||
09/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |