|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/02/1931 | 11/04/1931 | 44 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1933 | 05/08/1933 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2099 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1936 | 03/07/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2122 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1939 | 08/04/1939 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1942 | 29/08/1942 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 42 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 100 days | General | Boiler number 2779 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1948 | 18/02/1948 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 8772 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4750 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1948 | 19/11/1948 | 82 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR 64750 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1948 | 22/01/1949 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Derby Works | 11/06/1951 | 17/08/1951 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 27671 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/11/1953 | 08/01/1954 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27880 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/08/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27875 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/12/1947 | Crewe Works | New Construction 7/12: In addition to Nos. 6256 and 4765 mentioned, No. 4766 was complete. No. 4767 had the frames, cylinders and boiler mounted, No. 4748 frames and cylinders-boiler not yet mounted-while frames and cylinders for Nos. 4749/50 were all in the Erecting Shop. The frames and cylinders of Nos: 4751/2 were in the Yard, while the Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for No. 6257. The frames only of Nos. 4753/54/55 were visible. Nos. 4759/61 were under repair, while No. 4762 was on the North Shed. No less than 13 of the L.N.E.R. '0.6's' were on the Works. | SLS/194801 |
01/02/1948 | Crewe Works | Locomotives relettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' were M4820 (North Shed), M6170, and M5101 in the Paint Shop. All three had cast plates bolted in front of the existing numberplate on th; smokebox door. New construction at the Works included: Nos. 4767 with Stephenson motion and M4748, first of the Caprotti's outside the Paint Shop. The Erecting Shop contained Nos. 6257 (frames, cylinders, and boiler), 4749 (complete), 4750 (frames, cylinders, and boiler), 4751 (frames and cylinders; boiler not mounted) and 4752 (frames and cylinders only), while out in the Yard were the frames and cylinders for 4753-56 inclusive, and 6154 (presumably next for rebuilding). The Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for the first of the next batch of 4-6-0's, presumably 4738 and also for 4757, as well as the frames only of 6105 | SLS/194803 |
31/03/1948 | Crewe Works | New construction for the past month includes three more class '5' Caprotti 4-6-0's, Nos. 4750 , 4751 and 4752 completed on 17/2, 24/2 and 5/3 respectively, class '7P' 4-6-2 No. 6257 completed on 26/2, and 'Royal Scot' conversion No. 6154 completed on 27/2. It is understood that No. 6105 is the next 'Royal Scot' to be rebuilt with a tapered boiler. No. 6257 bears the name City of Salford, and on 3/3 was noted in photographic livery on the weighbridge. It has all the latest modifications incorporated in No. 6256, and is No. 5 of order E 464. A Johnson '2F' 0-6-0 No. 3084 (Ex 2D) has been allocated to the C.M.E. Dept., Crewe, and is to be used on the daily trip between the Works and Basford Hall Sidings. Ex L. & N.W.R. engines continue to disappear steadily; among the latest batch of engines to go to the scrap heap were Service locomotives Nos. 3248/9 (the last 0-4-2ST Crane engines) and 0-4-0ST No. 3084. Scrapping dates from the middle of January are as follows:-W/E 17/1: Nos. 9206, 28343; w/e 24/1, 9374, 28546, 28550; w/e 31/1, 6674, 25791; w/e 7/2, 6754, 25775; w/e 14/2, 9182, 27648; w/e 21/2, 7715, 9175; w/e 28/2, 3084, 3249, 9251, 28117; w/e 6/3, 3248, 6729 an 28145 | SLS/194804 |
28/06/1951 | Derby Works | New class 5MT complete up to 73007, 73008 almost finished. 73009 frames and cylinders, 73010/1 frames only. In works for special examination were 40444, 41005 and (4)1856. Other interesting locos were 43218 (71H), 43787 (8B), 47337 (12E), 22912 (11B), 64808 (39B), 64724 (9G), 64750 (38A). | SLS/195108 |
29/12/1951 | Scottish Miscellany | Of the B.R. 2-6-4T Nos. 80020-2 are at Kittybrewster, 80023/6 at Polmadie and 80024/5 at Corkerhill. Ivatt 2-6-0 43133 has arrived at Eastfield depot. Ex-L.M.S. Class 5 4-6-0s now work regularly over the West Highland line. During the New Year week V2 class engines worked frequently on the Edinburgh-Glasgow turns. Towards the end of December Class J39 64750 was noted being towed to Cowlairs Works after a 'pitch-in.' Regular Sunday cheap day excursion tickets are now being given from Glasgow to more distant towns, e.g., by 7.15 a.m. to Grantown-on-Spey West; Hawick by 9.40 a.m. | SLS/195203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2697 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1411 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
27/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931. | ||
11/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2099 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1936. Dep: 03/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2122 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1939. Dep: 08/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
25/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. | ||
16/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2779 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4750 | ||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1948. Dep: 18/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8772 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4750 |
||
30/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 19/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64750 |
||
29/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1948. Dep: 22/01/1949. | ||
11/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1951. Dep: 17/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27671 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
26/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1953. Dep: 08/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27880 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
10/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27875 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64750 from Stratford (30A) | ||
12/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |