Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 1018 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3117 Week
» 14688 Month
» 262981 Year
» 1147362 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2698   14/08/1928
LNER (1946) 4751   08/09/1946
BR 64751   28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 14/08/1928 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal Mon 07/12/1959 off Lincoln (40A)
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 31 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) 14/08/1928
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 31/05/1933
ARD Ardsley 31/07/1933
40D Tuxford 27/09/1953
30A Stratford 16/01/1955
31A Cambridge 15/05/1955
31B March 28/08/1958
40A Lincoln 07/12/1958
   Withdrawn 07/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   07/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
14/08/1928 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2103)
15/12/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2210)
27/05/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2220)
18/05/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2294)
06/06/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4903)
11/05/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1921)
26/02/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27658)
27/11/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27692)
25/07/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27845)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/01/1931 14/02/1931 37 days General  
Gorton Works 26/11/1934 15/12/1934 20 days General
Boiler number 2210 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1937 27/05/1937 25 days General
Boiler number 2220 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1940 18/05/1940 26 days General
Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 01/10/1941 29/01/1941 -244 days Heavy  
Cowlairs Works 28/03/1943 06/06/1943 71 days General
Boiler number 4903 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 07/06/1943 11/06/1943 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 02/10/1944 25/11/1944 55 days General  
Stratford Works 04/03/1946 11/05/1946 69 days General
Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1947 07/10/1947 181 days General  
Gorton Works 21/06/1948 28/08/1948 69 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 64751
 
Derby Works 11/01/1951 26/02/1951 47 days General
Boiler number 27658 (Diagram 97)
 
Derby Works 16/02/1952 13/03/1952 27 days Heavy Intermediate  
Stratford Works 24/10/1954 27/11/1954 35 days General
Boiler number 27692 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 10/12/1954 14/12/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 26/05/1957 25/07/1957 61 days General
Boiler number 27845 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 11/08/1957 15/08/1957 5 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/08/1928 To Service To service as LNER Number 2698
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
09/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1931. Dep: 14/02/1931.    
31/05/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
31/07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
26/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2210 (Diagram 97)
   
03/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1937. Dep: 27/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2220 (Diagram 97)
   
23/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97)
   
01/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/10/1941. Dep: 29/01/1941.    
28/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1943. Dep: 06/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4903 (Diagram 97)
   
07/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1943. Dep: 11/06/1943.    
02/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944.    
04/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97)
   
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4751    
10/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1947. Dep: 07/10/1947.    
21/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64751
   
11/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1951. Dep: 26/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27658 (Diagram 97)
   
16/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/02/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952.    
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
24/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1954. Dep: 27/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27692 (Diagram 97)
   
10/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1954. Dep: 14/12/1954.    
16/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
26/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1957. Dep: 25/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27845 (Diagram 97)
   
11/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1957. Dep: 15/08/1957.    
28/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
07/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64751 from Lincoln (40A)    

prev prev