|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/03/1931 | 02/05/1931 | 37 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1933 | 15/07/1933 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2094 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1936 | 06/05/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2128 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1937 | 24/07/1937 | 25 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1938 | 06/10/1938 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1940 | 13/07/1940 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2689 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 66 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/05/1943 | 30/05/1943 | 30 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1944 | 19/08/1944 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 22/07/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 2697 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 71 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4752 |
||
Stratford Works | 22/07/1947 | 18/08/1947 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1948 | 14/03/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2273 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4752 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1948 | 06/04/1948 | 16 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to BR 64752 |
||
Derby Works | 14/06/1950 | 26/07/1950 | 43 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 30/03/1952 | 21/05/1952 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27695 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/10/1952 | 26/11/1952 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 17/02/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 18/09/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27723 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/12/1947 | Crewe Works | New Construction 7/12: In addition to Nos. 6256 and 4765 mentioned, No. 4766 was complete. No. 4767 had the frames, cylinders and boiler mounted, No. 4748 frames and cylinders-boiler not yet mounted-while frames and cylinders for Nos. 4749/50 were all in the Erecting Shop. The frames and cylinders of Nos: 4751/2 were in the Yard, while the Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for No. 6257. The frames only of Nos. 4753/54/55 were visible. Nos. 4759/61 were under repair, while No. 4762 was on the North Shed. No less than 13 of the L.N.E.R. '0.6's' were on the Works. | SLS/194801 |
01/02/1948 | Crewe Works | Locomotives relettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' were M4820 (North Shed), M6170, and M5101 in the Paint Shop. All three had cast plates bolted in front of the existing numberplate on th; smokebox door. New construction at the Works included: Nos. 4767 with Stephenson motion and M4748, first of the Caprotti's outside the Paint Shop. The Erecting Shop contained Nos. 6257 (frames, cylinders, and boiler), 4749 (complete), 4750 (frames, cylinders, and boiler), 4751 (frames and cylinders; boiler not mounted) and 4752 (frames and cylinders only), while out in the Yard were the frames and cylinders for 4753-56 inclusive, and 6154 (presumably next for rebuilding). The Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for the first of the next batch of 4-6-0's, presumably 4738 and also for 4757, as well as the frames only of 6105 | SLS/194803 |
31/03/1948 | Crewe Works | New construction for the past month includes three more class '5' Caprotti 4-6-0's, Nos. 4750 , 4751 and 4752 completed on 17/2, 24/2 and 5/3 respectively, class '7P' 4-6-2 No. 6257 completed on 26/2, and 'Royal Scot' conversion No. 6154 completed on 27/2. It is understood that No. 6105 is the next 'Royal Scot' to be rebuilt with a tapered boiler. No. 6257 bears the name City of Salford, and on 3/3 was noted in photographic livery on the weighbridge. It has all the latest modifications incorporated in No. 6256, and is No. 5 of order E 464. A Johnson '2F' 0-6-0 No. 3084 (Ex 2D) has been allocated to the C.M.E. Dept., Crewe, and is to be used on the daily trip between the Works and Basford Hall Sidings. Ex L. & N.W.R. engines continue to disappear steadily; among the latest batch of engines to go to the scrap heap were Service locomotives Nos. 3248/9 (the last 0-4-2ST Crane engines) and 0-4-0ST No. 3084. Scrapping dates from the middle of January are as follows:-W/E 17/1: Nos. 9206, 28343; w/e 24/1, 9374, 28546, 28550; w/e 31/1, 6674, 25791; w/e 7/2, 6754, 25775; w/e 14/2, 9182, 27648; w/e 21/2, 7715, 9175; w/e 28/2, 3084, 3249, 9251, 28117; w/e 6/3, 3248, 6729 an 28145 | SLS/194804 |
08/07/1950 | Derby Works | Engines into works: 40410, 413, 40929, 41088, 41752, 41902, 3574. 3579, 44127, 44242, 44262, 44277, 44575, 47301, 47426, 47513, 12011, 58229, 64752, 64906. | SLS/195008 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2699 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1413 Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
27/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931. | ||
23/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1933. Dep: 15/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2094 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
15/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1936. Dep: 06/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2128 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. | ||
22/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1938. Dep: 06/10/1938. | ||
13/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2689 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. | ||
01/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1943. Dep: 30/05/1943. | ||
11/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
16/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/07/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944. | ||
22/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2697 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4752 |
||
22/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1947. Dep: 18/08/1947. | ||
01/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1948. Dep: 14/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2273 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4752 |
||
22/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1948. Dep: 06/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64752 |
||
14/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/06/1950. Dep: 26/07/1950. | ||
30/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1952. Dep: 21/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27695 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/10/1952. Dep: 26/11/1952. | ||
17/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955. | ||
18/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27723 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64752 from Ipswich (32B) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |