|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/05/1931 | 04/07/1931 | 39 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1934 | 23/05/1934 | 20 days | General | New type fire door Boiler number 8592 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1935 | 23/10/1935 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1938 | 24/11/1938 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1941 | 08/12/1941 | 62 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/02/1943 | 04/07/1943 | 138 days | General | Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 27 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 147 days | General | Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4754 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1950 | 04/03/1950 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 4986 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64754 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1950 | 14/03/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1950 | 06/04/1950 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 20/11/1952 | 17/12/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 27736 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 02/01/1953 | 24/01/1953 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1955 | 26/11/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27691 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1959 | 28/08/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27841 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1961 | 17/06/1961 | 25 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2701 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1415 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
27/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931. | ||
04/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1934. Dep: 23/05/1934. Work undertaken: New type fire door Boiler number 8592 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1935. Dep: 23/10/1935. | ||
26/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1938. Dep: 24/11/1938. | ||
08/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1941. Dep: 08/12/1941. | ||
17/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 04/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. | ||
16/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4754 |
||
06/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1950. Dep: 04/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4986 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64754 |
||
08/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1950. Dep: 14/03/1950. | ||
21/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1950. Dep: 06/04/1950. | ||
20/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1952. Dep: 17/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27736 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1953. Dep: 24/01/1953. | ||
23/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1955. Dep: 26/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27691 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957. | ||
21/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1959. Dep: 28/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27841 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/05/1961. Dep: 17/06/1961. | ||
12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64754 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |