|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/10/1930 | 22/11/1930 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1933 | 04/03/1933 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2112 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1933 | 29/03/1933 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1935 | 22/06/1935 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1936 | 26/12/1936 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 8588 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1939 | 15/04/1939 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 1917 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1941 | 14/12/1941 | 79 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 06/07/1944 | 18/08/1944 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1945 | 1 day | W | ||||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/04/1947 | 09/08/1947 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 2253 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1948 | 24/02/1948 | 6 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4756 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/03/1949 | 11/06/1949 | 81 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64756 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/12/1950 | 19/01/1951 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/05/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27479 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/09/1955 | 20/10/1955 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/05/1956 | 09/06/1956 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/01/1960 | 05/03/1960 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27504 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/03/1960 | 24/03/1960 | 2 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/02/1948 | Crewe Works | Locomotives relettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' were M4820 (North Shed), M6170, and M5101 in the Paint Shop. All three had cast plates bolted in front of the existing numberplate on th; smokebox door. New construction at the Works included: Nos. 4767 with Stephenson motion and M4748, first of the Caprotti's outside the Paint Shop. The Erecting Shop contained Nos. 6257 (frames, cylinders, and boiler), 4749 (complete), 4750 (frames, cylinders, and boiler), 4751 (frames and cylinders; boiler not mounted) and 4752 (frames and cylinders only), while out in the Yard were the frames and cylinders for 4753-56 inclusive, and 6154 (presumably next for rebuilding). The Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for the first of the next batch of 4-6-0's, presumably 4738 and also for 4757, as well as the frames only of 6105 | SLS/194803 |
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
31/03/1948 | Crewe Works | Two more Class '5' 4-6-0's of order E468 have been completed: No. 4753 on 12/3 and 4754 on 20/3. No. 4755, the first of three Caprotti engines to be fitted with a double chimney and electric lighting, is nearing completion and should be in traffic by the end of April. Owing to the irregular supply of roller bearing axleboxes, due no doubt to the shortage of material, the construction of Nos. 4756/7 is held up, and work has therefore started on the first two engines of order E469, Nos. 4738/9, the frames of which are in the Erecting Shop. The latest 'Royal Scot' conversion is No. 6154 , completed on 27/3, to be followed by Nos. 6105/37; the former is nearing completion and will probably be in traffic by the end of April. Several more ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap heap recently, they were cut-up as follows:-Nos. 6636 W/E 27/3, 6682 W E 10/4; 6930 W/E 13/3, 7682 W/E 20/3, 27636 W/E 3/4 and 27664 W/E 3/4. The first engines to be re-numbered at Crewe (by the addition of 40000 to the existing number) were done during the W/E 3/4, the engines being Nos. 4754, 5069, 5292, 5411 an 5530 . The numerals on the cab sides are of the Gill Sans type, about nine inches in height. | SLS/194805 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2703 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1417 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
06/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
08/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930. | ||
14/02/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/03/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
04/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
14/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1933. Dep: 04/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2112 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1933. Dep: 29/03/1933. | ||
29/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1935. Dep: 22/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
10/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8588 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
14/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1939. Dep: 15/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1917 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
25/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
03/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1941. Dep: 14/12/1941. | ||
06/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1944. Dep: 18/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
14/07/1945 | Works Visit | |||
19/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/03/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4756 | ||
05/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2253 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/02/1948. Dep: 24/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4756 |
||
27/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
03/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
23/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1949. Dep: 11/06/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64756 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
30/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
15/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/12/1950. Dep: 19/01/1951. | ||
15/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27479 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
06/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
03/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
26/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1955. Dep: 20/10/1955. | ||
10/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/05/1956. Dep: 09/06/1956. | ||
20/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1960. Dep: 05/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27504 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1960. Dep: 24/03/1960. | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64756 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |