|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/07/1930 | 16/08/1930 | 37 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1931 | 21/03/1931 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1932 | 02/04/1932 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1933 | 14/10/1933 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1936 | 14/03/1936 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2194 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1939 | 18/02/1939 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 8589 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1939 | 27/02/1939 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1939 | 14/03/1939 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1941 | 10/01/1942 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2119 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1943 | 02/10/1943 | 139 days | General | Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/03/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 158 days | General | Boiler number 2767 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4759 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1948 | 22/01/1949 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 3170 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64759 |
||
Derby Works | 14/03/1951 | 27/04/1951 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 30/09/1953 | 14/11/1953 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27877 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1956 | 22/12/1956 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27751 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/04/1951 | Derby Works | By mid-April, 73000 was finished, painted grey and running trials. Engines from other regions entering works were 42305 (87K), 42513 (33A), 64759 (36E), 64721 (36A), 42514 (33A), 64726 (32A), 64788 (30F). Position of engines stored not materially altered. | SLS/195105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/09/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2706 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1420 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930. | ||
25/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931. | ||
21/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932. | ||
02/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/03/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
11/04/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
27/06/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
05/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2194 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1939. Dep: 18/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8589 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1939. Dep: 27/02/1939. | ||
09/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1939. Dep: 14/03/1939. | ||
26/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
29/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2119 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2767 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4759 |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
24/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1948. Dep: 22/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3170 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64759 |
||
14/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/03/1951. Dep: 27/04/1951. | ||
30/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27877 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27751 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
15/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64759 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |