|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/06/1930 | 09/08/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1933 | 31/03/1933 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1935 | 19/07/1935 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1938 | 03/03/1938 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1940 | 26/10/1940 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/05/1943 | 24/06/1943 | 49 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 130 days | General | Boiler number 2108 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1948 | 31/07/1948 | 70 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64760 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1949 | 24/09/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2695 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 22/01/1951 | 13/03/1951 | 51 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1953 | 03/10/1953 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 27659 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1953 | 13/10/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1956 | 19/05/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27741 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1959 | 26/03/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27593 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1961 | 16/02/1961 | 31 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/09/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2707 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1421 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
20/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1930. Dep: 09/08/1930. | ||
13/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1933. Dep: 31/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/12/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1935. Dep: 19/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1938. Dep: 03/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
18/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
11/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
07/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1943. Dep: 24/06/1943. | ||
22/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4760 | ||
12/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2108 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1948. Dep: 31/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64760 |
||
17/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2695 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. | ||
22/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 22/01/1951. Dep: 13/03/1951. | ||
17/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27659 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1953. Dep: 13/10/1953. | ||
07/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1956. Dep: 19/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27741 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1959. Dep: 26/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27593 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1961. Dep: 16/02/1961. | ||
30/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64760 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |