Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2708   19/09/1928
LNER (1946) 4761   25/08/1946
BR 64761   04/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 19/09/1928 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1959 off Norwich Thorpe (32A)
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 31 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 19/09/1928
MAR March 28/07/1934
CAM Cambridge 12/12/1940
MAR March 09/03/1941
NOR Norwich Thorpe 16/09/1943
   Withdrawn 06/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   06/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
19/09/1928 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2122)
21/10/1931 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2188)
28/07/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2191)
24/10/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2274)
31/08/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 826)
26/10/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 824)
08/05/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2672)
19/05/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8593)
04/03/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number RS120)
08/01/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27824)
28/09/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27692)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 30/10/1929 07/12/1929 39 days Heavy
New cylinders
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1931 21/10/1931 33 days General
Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1934 28/07/1934 16 days General
Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1936 24/10/1936 27 days General
Boiler number 2274 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1938 31/08/1938 30 days General
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1940 26/10/1940 49 days General
Boiler number 824 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 10/01/1943 08/05/1943 119 days General
Boiler number 2672 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1945 19/05/1945 80 days General
Boiler number 8593 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1946 26/10/1946 42 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 14/05/1947 14/08/1947 93 days General  
Gorton Works 27/01/1950 04/03/1950 37 days General
Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64761
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1950 23/03/1950 16 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 24/10/1952 12/12/1952 50 days Heavy Intermediate  
Stratford Works 14/11/1954 08/01/1955 56 days General
Boiler number 27824 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 25/08/1957 28/09/1957 35 days General
Boiler number 27692 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/09/1928 To Service To service as LNER Number 2708
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
30/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/10/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
   
19/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 21/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97)
   
13/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97)
   
28/07/1934 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
28/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2274 (Diagram 97)
   
02/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1938. Dep: 31/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97)
   
08/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 824 (Diagram 97)
   
12/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
09/03/1941 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
10/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2672 (Diagram 97)
   
16/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
01/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8593 (Diagram 97)
   
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4761    
15/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946.    
14/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1947. Dep: 14/08/1947.    
27/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1950. Dep: 04/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64761
   
08/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1950. Dep: 23/03/1950.    
24/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/10/1952. Dep: 12/12/1952.    
14/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1954. Dep: 08/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27824 (Diagram 97)
   
25/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27692 (Diagram 97)
   
06/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64761 from Norwich Thorpe (32A)    

prev prev