Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 220 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7680 Week
» 5193 Month
» 233077 Year
» 1454642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2709 on 28/09/1928
LNER (1946) 4762   29/08/1946
BR (BR Tmp) E4762   18/02/1948
BR 64762   19/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 28/09/1928 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 30 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) 28/09/1928
ANN Annesley 31/10/1928
LIN Lincoln 24/06/1929
ARD Ardsley 07/08/1929
ANN Annesley 20/08/1929
LIN Lincoln 20/06/1930
ARD Ardsley 05/08/1930
ANN Annesley 21/08/1930
CLK Colwick 30/03/1947
   Withdrawn 29/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   29/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/09/1928 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2123)
06/02/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8003)
05/05/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2216)
26/02/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2093)
05/03/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2294)
04/05/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8590)
12/09/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2666)
10/03/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2769)
18/02/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2309)
20/08/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4917)
25/04/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27754)
29/10/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27795)
30/11/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27888)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1950 Derby Works For works: 12000, 40012/51/8, 40353, 414, 40498, 40515, 527, 40567, 684, 40917/26/8, 41017/58/72/7/81, 41124/60/9, 41710, 1748, 41961, 42508/15, 3099, 43216/24, 3271, 43283, 3484, 43538, 3738/59/60, 43835/54/62, 43909/16/29/94, 44020/45/94/6, 44137, 44414/33/75, 44566, 47220, 7237, 47287, 7324, 47356, 7395, 7403/5/17/51, 47506, 7507,7542/81, 58033, 1406, 58080, 58224, W.2108 and 'J.39' 4721/37/85, 64980, 4956. Ex Works: 42146, UTA.57, 12070-3 (new): and after repair 40410, 40535/56, 40929, 41088, 41535, 41672, 41752, 41889, 42353, 42510, 43224, 43446, 43574, 43690, 44127/37/90, 44242, 44362, 44414/72, 44521, 47280, 47342/56/65, 47426, 47526, 58220/4/9, 64762/84/97, 64960 and 2097. New Construction, in various stages 2-6-4T 42050-4 (Order 4310) and D/E 12074/5 almost complete. Being cut up 41034, 58036 (24/8). The works yard contained 22853, 43818, 43297, 41017, 3511, 40515 (all condemned) and 58033, 1406, 40498 (under consideration). SLS/195012
15/09/1950 Derby Works For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E.
New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station.
Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted).
SLS/195012

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/01/1932 06/02/1932 23 days General
Boiler number 8003 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1934 05/05/1934 23 days General
Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 23/01/1936 26/02/1936 35 days General
Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1938 05/03/1938 27 days General
Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1940 04/05/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1942 12/09/1942 66 days General
Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1943 15/01/1944 17 days General  
Gorton Works 30/12/1944 10/03/1945 71 days General
Boiler number 2769 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1946 19/10/1946 107 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4762
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1947 18/02/1948 87 days General
Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E4762
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1948 19/11/1948 88 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 64762
 
Derby Works 15/05/1950 20/08/1950 98 days General
Boiler number 4917 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1953 25/04/1953 53 days General
Boiler number 27754 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1953 23/05/1953 24 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/07/1954 09/10/1954 72 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 16/08/1955 29/10/1955 75 days General
Boiler number 27795 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1955 30/11/1955 26 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/10/1957 30/11/1957 48 days General
Boiler number 27888 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1958 26/04/1958 18 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/09/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2709
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
31/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
24/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
07/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
20/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
05/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
21/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1932. Dep: 06/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8003 (Diagram 97)
   
13/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97)
   
23/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1936. Dep: 26/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97)
   
07/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97)
   
30/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97)
   
09/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97)
   
30/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944.    
30/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1944. Dep: 10/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2769 (Diagram 97)
   
05/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4762
   
30/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1947. Dep: 18/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E4762
   
24/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1948. Dep: 19/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64762
   
15/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1950. Dep: 20/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4917 (Diagram 97)
   
04/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27754 (Diagram 97)
   
30/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953.    
30/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954.    
16/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27795 (Diagram 97)
   
05/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/11/1955. Dep: 30/11/1955.    
14/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27888 (Diagram 97)
   
09/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958.    
29/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64762 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev