|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/09/1930 | 25/10/1930 | 37 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1932 | 25/11/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1933 | 16/02/1933 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1935 | 18/05/1935 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8019 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1937 | 23/10/1937 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1940 | 03/08/1940 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 2128 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/05/1942 | 10/06/1942 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1943 | 29/09/1943 | 91 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 27/08/1946 | 19/11/1946 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 8020 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4765 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1949 | 13/08/1949 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 2296 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64765 |
||
Derby Works | 16/06/1950 | 07/09/1950 | 84 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 10/09/1950 | 03/10/1950 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 17/03/1952 | 09/05/1952 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27806 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 07/02/1955 | 25/03/1955 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27683 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/09/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27806 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/07/1950 | Derby Works | Engines into works: 1672, 41903, 42310, 3361, 43446, 4007, 44024, 44190, 44230, 44362, 4521, 7233, 47256, 7280, 7365, 12068, 53802, 53804, 58036. 58234, 64765, 64962, 2097. | SLS/195008 |
15/09/1950 | Derby Works | For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E. New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station. Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted). |
SLS/195012 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/10/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2712 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1426 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
22/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
19/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1930. Dep: 25/10/1930. | ||
28/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1932. Dep: 25/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1933. Dep: 16/02/1933. | ||
23/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8019 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2128 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1942. Dep: 10/06/1942. | ||
01/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1943. Dep: 29/09/1943. | ||
27/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1946. Dep: 19/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8020 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4765 |
||
25/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
16/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
26/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2296 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64765 |
||
16/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/06/1950. Dep: 07/09/1950. | ||
10/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/09/1950. Dep: 03/10/1950. | ||
17/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 09/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27806 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
30/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
07/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1955. Dep: 25/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27683 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27806 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64765 from Stratford (30A) | ||
09/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |