|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/03/1931 | 04/04/1931 | 34 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1933 | 26/08/1933 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2104 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1935 | 27/11/1935 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1938 | 04/06/1938 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1940 | 15/12/1940 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/03/1944 | 07/04/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/10/1947 | 05/02/1948 | 108 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4767 |
||
Stratford Works | 15/05/1948 | 31/07/1948 | 78 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64767 |
||
Derby Works | 10/01/1952 | 25/02/1952 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27809 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 31/01/1955 | 11/03/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2186 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/02/1958 | 03/04/1958 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27724 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/03/1961 | Stratford Works (Scrap Yard) | Old Works: D2202/3/16, D2950, D3496, 11157, 12132. Scrap Yard: 64698, 64767, 67726, 69681, 69721. Works Yard: D2214, D5047/94, D8405, 62015, 69656, 69702. Diesel Erecting Shop: D200/48, D5036/59/60/6/95, D5630/6/66, D5901/4, D8206, D8403/6. Erecting Shop Yard: D2575, D5040/1, D5903, DEPT33/44/5. Works Shunters: D2209/17, D2958, 12111. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/01/1905 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/11/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2714 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1428 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
03/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
02/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1931. Dep: 04/04/1931. | ||
01/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1933. Dep: 26/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2104 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1935. Dep: 27/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
03/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1940. Dep: 15/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
16/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4767 | ||
21/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1947. Dep: 05/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4767 |
||
15/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1948. Dep: 31/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64767 |
||
15/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
21/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
24/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
28/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
15/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
16/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
10/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1952. Dep: 25/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27809 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1955. Dep: 11/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2186 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1958. Dep: 03/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27724 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/01/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64767 from Stratford (30A) | ||
06/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |