|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/01/1931 | 07/03/1931 | 37 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1933 | 29/09/1933 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1936 | 21/02/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8584 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1936 | 28/02/1936 | 7 days | Unclassified | Tender only |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1938 | 17/09/1938 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2119 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1941 | 14/06/1941 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/05/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27770 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/08/1945 | 19/09/1945 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 07/05/1947 | 08/11/1947 | 186 days | General | |||
Derby Works | 27/06/1951 | 30/08/1951 | 65 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64768 |
||
Stratford Works | 30/12/1952 | 24/01/1953 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 23/06/1954 | 07/08/1954 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27845 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/04/1957 | 24/05/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27706 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 12/03/1958 | 28/03/1958 | 17 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1951 | Derby Works | During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. | SLS/195109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/11/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2715 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1429 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
05/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
30/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1931. Dep: 07/03/1931. | ||
11/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1933. Dep: 29/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1936. Dep: 21/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8584 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1936. Dep: 28/02/1936. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
15/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2119 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27770 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 19/09/1945. | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4768 | ||
07/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1947. Dep: 08/11/1947. | ||
15/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
21/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
18/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
24/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/06/1951. Dep: 30/08/1951. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64768 |
||
30/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1952. Dep: 24/01/1953. | ||
23/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1954. Dep: 07/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27845 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1957. Dep: 24/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27706 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/03/1958. Dep: 28/03/1958. | ||
18/05/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64768 from Stratford (30A) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |