|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/01/1931 | 07/03/1931 | 37 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1933 | 18/11/1933 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8014 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1936 | 04/04/1936 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1937 | 18/09/1937 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1940 | 20/07/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/11/1941 | 30/12/1941 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 28/08/1943 | 16/10/1943 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3175 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/12/1944 | 23/02/1945 | 72 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 15/09/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 824 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1948 | 16/10/1948 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64770 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1949 | 15/04/1950 | 106 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1950 | 25/05/1950 | 37 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 26/03/1951 | 01/06/1951 | 68 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 02/02/1953 | 17/03/1953 | 44 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 21/10/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27802 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/05/1956 | 23/06/1956 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27873 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/11/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2717 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1431 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/01/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
30/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1931. Dep: 07/03/1931. | ||
24/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8014 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1937. Dep: 18/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/11/1941. Dep: 30/12/1941. | ||
28/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3175 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1944. Dep: 23/02/1945. | ||
15/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 824 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4770 | ||
10/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64770 |
||
31/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 31/12/1949. Dep: 15/04/1950. | ||
19/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/04/1950. Dep: 25/05/1950. | ||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
26/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/03/1951. Dep: 01/06/1951. | ||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
08/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
28/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
02/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 17/03/1953. | ||
21/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27802 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27873 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
19/10/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64770 from March (31B) | ||
11/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |