|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/06/1931 | 04/07/1931 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1933 | 18/11/1933 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2119 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1935 | 27/12/1935 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 8772 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1938 | 02/07/1938 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1944 | 22/12/1944 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2671 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/03/1947 | 12/07/1947 | 112 days | General | Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/10/1947 | 31/10/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1948 | 23/10/1948 | 87 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64771 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1950 | 10/06/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 4936 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1950 | 03/07/1950 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 01/01/1953 | 02/04/1953 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 27748 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/09/1953 | 18/09/1953 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 07/04/1955 | 06/05/1955 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 14/11/1955 | 23/12/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27719 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/09/1956 | 20/09/1956 | 4 days | Light Casual | March 27/4/58-28/1/60 In store |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/04/1905 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
30/11/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2718 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1432 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
05/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2119 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1935. Dep: 27/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8772 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/04/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
12/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1944. Dep: 22/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2671 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4771 | ||
23/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1947. Dep: 12/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1947. Dep: 31/10/1947. | ||
29/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64771 |
||
28/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1950. Dep: 10/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4936 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/06/1950. Dep: 03/07/1950. | ||
15/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
16/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
14/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
21/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
01/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1953. Dep: 02/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27748 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1953. Dep: 18/09/1953. | ||
07/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1955. Dep: 06/05/1955. | ||
14/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27719 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1956. Dep: 20/09/1956. Work undertaken: March 27/4/58-28/1/60 In store |
||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
20/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
01/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64771 from March (31B) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |