Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 593 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 593 Week
» 30091 Month
» 366937 Year
» 1588502 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2719 on 04/12/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4772   17/08/1946
British Railways 64772   08/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 04/12/1928 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 03/07/1961 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 07/1961
Service Life 32 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford on 01/12/1928
YK York (North) (New) on 04/12/1928
PKS Parkeston Quay on 26/01/1929
COL Colchester on 30/07/1936
STR Stratford on 25/09/1939
COL Colchester on 03/12/1939
STR Stratford on 02/11/1941
31B March on 23/03/1958
   Withdrawn on 03/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   on 03/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/12/1928 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2146)
07/04/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8586)
12/12/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8012)
14/10/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8015)
18/08/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP140)
26/01/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2114)
08/10/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP143)
03/12/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27713)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 31/10/1930 13/12/1930 44 days General  
Gorton Works 16/03/1934 07/04/1934 23 days General
Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1936 12/12/1936 18 days General
Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 09/12/1937 24/12/1937 16 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/06/1939 14/10/1939 108 days General
Boiler number 8015 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 20/06/1942 18/08/1942 60 days General
Boiler number BP140 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 21/10/1945 26/01/1946 98 days General
Boiler number 2114 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 28/06/1946 17/08/1946 51 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4772
 
Stratford Works 06/06/1947 03/09/1947 90 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 23/08/1949 08/10/1949 47 days General
Boiler number 27772 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64772
 
Stratford Works 17/12/1952 16/03/1953 90 days General  
Stratford Works 24/10/1955 03/12/1955 41 days General
Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1942 L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
04/12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2719
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
26/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
31/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1930. Dep: 13/12/1930.    
16/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97)
   
30/07/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
25/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1936. Dep: 12/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97)
   
09/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1937. Dep: 24/12/1937.    
29/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8015 (Diagram 97)
   
25/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
03/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
02/11/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
20/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1942. Dep: 18/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number BP140 (Diagram 97)
   
21/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1945. Dep: 26/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2114 (Diagram 97)
   
28/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4772
   
06/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/06/1947. Dep: 03/09/1947.    
23/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27772 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64772
   
17/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1952. Dep: 16/03/1953.    
24/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97)
   
23/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64772 from March (31B)    

prev prev