Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 189 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 22695 Month
» 325885 Year
» 1547450 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2720 on 06/12/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4773   22/11/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E4773   03/03/1948
British Railways 64773   20/07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 06/12/1928 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Tue 25/08/1959 off Stratford (30A)
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 30 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 06/12/1928
STR Stratford on 14/12/1928
PKS Parkeston Quay on 25/01/1929
COL Colchester on 05/11/1935
STR Stratford on 25/09/1939
COL Colchester on 03/12/1939
STR Stratford on 20/07/1941
COL Colchester on 03/08/1941
STR Stratford on 19/01/1946
32B Ipswich on 22/10/1950
30A Stratford on 19/01/1951
30F Parkeston Quay on 12/08/1951
30A Stratford on 13/04/1958
   Withdrawn on 25/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32B Ipswich w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 18/08/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   on 25/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/05/1904 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2186)
06/12/1928 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2136)
24/03/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2300)
01/05/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8024)
25/02/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8016)
03/03/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2303)
06/02/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27821)
15/12/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27874)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/02/1931 14/03/1931 32 days General  
Gorton Works 05/03/1934 24/03/1934 20 days General
Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1937 01/05/1937 19 days General
Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1937 11/12/1937 5 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 03/02/1939 25/02/1939 23 days General
Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 21/06/1941 18/08/1941 59 days General  
Stratford Works 20/09/1942 03/10/1942 14 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 26/03/1944 06/05/1944 42 days General  
Stratford Works 01/05/1947 03/03/1948 308 days General
Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4773
 
Derby Works 13/06/1951 20/07/1951 38 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64773
 
Derby Works 09/10/1951 01/11/1951 24 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 29/12/1953 06/02/1954 40 days General
Boiler number 27821 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 22/10/1956 15/12/1956 55 days General
Boiler number 27874 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 27/02/1958 30/05/1958 93 days General
Not repaired
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/05/1904 Modification Diagram 97 number 2186 boiler fitted    
06/05/1904 Modification Diagram 97 number 27707 boiler fitted    
06/12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2720
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
14/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
25/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
11/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1931. Dep: 14/03/1931.    
05/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97)
   
05/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
13/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97)
   
07/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937.    
03/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97)
   
25/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
03/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
21/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 18/08/1941.    
20/07/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
03/08/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
20/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942.    
26/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1944. Dep: 06/05/1944.    
19/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
22/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4773    
01/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1947. Dep: 03/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4773
   
22/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
19/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1951. Dep: 20/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64773
   
12/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
09/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/10/1951. Dep: 01/11/1951.    
29/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1953. Dep: 06/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27821 (Diagram 97)
   
22/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27874 (Diagram 97)
   
27/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1958. Dep: 30/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
   
13/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64773 from Stratford (30A)    

prev prev