Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1078 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7467 Week
» 27909 Month
» 364755 Year
» 1586320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2721 on 26/03/1929
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4774   05/12/1946
British Railways 64774   24/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 26/03/1929 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Tue 15/03/1960 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 26/03/1929
PKS Parkeston Quay on 09/04/1929
STR Stratford on 25/09/1939
PKS Parkeston Quay on 24/06/1944
STR Stratford on 23/06/1945
31B March on 23/03/1958
   Withdrawn on 15/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   on 15/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/03/1929 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2203)
22/09/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2188)
12/08/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2186)
16/11/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 826)
15/01/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2641)
24/12/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2128)
18/11/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27747)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/05/1931 13/06/1931 30 days General  
Gorton Works 25/08/1934 22/09/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1937 12/08/1937 27 days General
Boiler number 2186 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1940 16/11/1940 35 days General
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 27/11/1943 15/01/1944 50 days General
Boiler number 2641 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 12/12/1946 28/05/1947 168 days General  
Gorton Works 23/10/1949 24/12/1949 63 days General
Boiler number 2128 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64774
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1949 05/01/1950 6 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 13/10/1952 26/11/1952 45 days Heavy Intermediate  
Stratford Works 08/03/1953 25/04/1953 49 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 28/09/1955 18/11/1955 52 days General
Boiler number 27747 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/03/1929 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2721
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
09/04/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
15/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931.    
25/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97)
   
17/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 12/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2186 (Diagram 97)
   
25/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
13/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1940. Dep: 16/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97)
   
27/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2641 (Diagram 97)
   
24/06/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
23/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
05/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4774    
12/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1946. Dep: 28/05/1947.    
23/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2128 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64774
   
31/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1949. Dep: 05/01/1950.    
13/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1952. Dep: 26/11/1952.    
08/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953.    
28/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1955. Dep: 18/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27747 (Diagram 97)
   
23/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64774 from March (31B)    

prev prev