|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/05/1931 | 13/06/1931 | 30 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1934 | 22/09/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/07/1937 | 12/08/1937 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2186 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1940 | 16/11/1940 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/11/1943 | 15/01/1944 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2641 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 12/12/1946 | 28/05/1947 | 168 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1949 | 24/12/1949 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 2128 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64774 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1949 | 05/01/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 13/10/1952 | 26/11/1952 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 08/03/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 49 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 28/09/1955 | 18/11/1955 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27747 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/03/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2721 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1445 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
15/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931. | ||
25/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 12/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2186 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
13/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1940. Dep: 16/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 826 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2641 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
23/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
05/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4774 | ||
12/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1946. Dep: 28/05/1947. | ||
23/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2128 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64774 |
||
31/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1949. Dep: 05/01/1950. | ||
13/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1952. Dep: 26/11/1952. | ||
08/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. | ||
28/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1955. Dep: 18/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27747 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
15/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64774 from March (31B) |