|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/01/1931 | 28/02/1931 | 30 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1933 | 15/11/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1936 | 05/05/1936 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1938 | 08/10/1938 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2274 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/12/1941 | 30/05/1942 | 155 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 05/06/1942 | 19/06/1942 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 22/03/1943 | 13/07/1943 | 114 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 29/11/1944 | 13/01/1945 | 46 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 09/09/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 84 days | General | Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1949 | 04/02/1950 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64776 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1950 | 23/02/1950 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 23/03/1953 | 21/05/1953 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27777 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/11/1955 | 13/01/1956 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 27746 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 28/04/1958 | 16/05/1958 | 19 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/04/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2723 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1447 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
31/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
30/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1931. Dep: 28/02/1931. | ||
25/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1933. Dep: 15/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
02/03/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
30/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1936. Dep: 05/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2274 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
08/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
27/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1941. Dep: 30/05/1942. | ||
05/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/06/1942. Dep: 19/06/1942. | ||
22/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1943. Dep: 13/07/1943. | ||
29/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945. | ||
09/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
26/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4776 | ||
04/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1949. Dep: 04/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64776 |
||
11/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1950. Dep: 23/02/1950. | ||
23/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1953. Dep: 21/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27777 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1955. Dep: 13/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27746 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
28/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1958. Dep: 16/05/1958. | ||
17/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64776 from Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
11/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |