Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 197 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5951 Week
» 33909 Month
» 68551 Year
» 1290116 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2741   12/07/1929
LNER (1946) 4794   09/06/1946
BR 64794   15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 12/07/1929 to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)
Withdrawal w/e Mon 13/08/1962 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 10/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Cut up at Inverurie

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge (New) 12/07/1929
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 01/08/1929
64A St Margarets 18/12/1949
64F Bathgate 10/05/1953
64A St Margarets 31/01/1954
64C Dalry Road 11/08/1958
62A Thornton Junction 18/12/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 13/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 06/09/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 6w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   w/e 13/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/07/1929 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2251)
17/03/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1801)
21/03/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1739)
16/04/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1738)
28/10/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2143)
24/12/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C2019)
13/08/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27534)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 02/1931 1 day General  
Cowlairs Works 17/03/1933   General
Boiler number C1801 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 19/09/1934 1 day General  
Cowlairs Works 21/03/1936 1 day General
Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 04/06/1937 1 day General  
Cowlairs Works 16/04/1939 1 day General
Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 28/09/1940 1 day General  
Cowlairs Works 29/11/1941 1 day General  
Cowlairs Works 19/08/1942 1 day Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 20/03/1943 1 day Heavy  
Cowlairs Works 28/10/1944 1 day General
Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97)
 
Inverurie Works 31/03/1945 31/05/1945 62 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 25/03/1947 12/04/1947 19 days Heavy  
Cowlairs Works 23/04/1948 15/05/1948 23 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 64794
 
Cowlairs Works 24/11/1949 24/12/1949 31 days General
Boiler number 27568 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 04/01/1950 06/01/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 17/11/1952 05/12/1952 19 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 01/07/1955 13/08/1955 44 days General
W.P.U. gear removed
Boiler number 2843 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 22/08/1955 25/08/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 31/08/1955 03/09/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 02/05/1957 07/06/1957 37 days Light Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 25/08/1960 28/09/1960 35 days Light Intermediate
A.W.S. fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/07/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 2741
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
01/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/02/1931.    
17/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Dep: 17/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1801 (Diagram 97)
   
19/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1934.    
21/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97)
   
04/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1937.    
16/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97)
   
28/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1940.    
29/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1941.    
19/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1942.    
20/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/03/1943.    
28/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97)
   
31/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 31/05/1945.    
09/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4794    
25/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/03/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947.    
23/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1948. Dep: 15/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64794
   
24/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27568 (Diagram 97)
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
04/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/01/1950. Dep: 06/01/1950.    
17/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 05/12/1952.    
10/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
31/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
01/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
W.P.U. gear removed
Boiler number 2843 (Diagram 97)
   
22/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1955. Dep: 25/08/1955.    
31/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1955. Dep: 03/09/1955.    
02/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/05/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957.    
11/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
25/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/08/1960. Dep: 28/09/1960.
Work undertaken:
A.W.S. fitted
   
18/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
13/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64794 from Thornton Junction (62A)    

prev prev