Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 242 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 242 Week
» 30532 Month
» 333722 Year
» 1555287 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2742 on 31/07/1929
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4795   11/08/1946
British Railways 64795 w/e 04/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 31/07/1929 to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Dunfermline Upper (62C)
Scrapping During 05/1963
Service Life 33 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Inverurie

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) on 31/07/1929
64A St Margarets on 10/03/1959
62C Dunfermline Upper on 22/01/1962
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 14/03/1959
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 03/02/1962
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
31/07/1929 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2253)
17/06/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1719)
01/12/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1713)
17/06/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1739)
25/06/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2636)
27/03/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27546)
06/04/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27543)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 17/06/1933 1 day General
Boiler number C1719 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 01/12/1934 1 day General
Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 11/06/1936 1 day General  
Cowlairs Works 04/12/1936 1 day Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 27/08/1937 1 day General  
Cowlairs Works 17/06/1939 1 day General
Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 01/07/1939 1 day Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 07/12/1940 1 day General  
Cowlairs Works 26/02/1943 1 day Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 20/08/1943 1 day Heavy  
Cowlairs Works 11/12/1943 1 day Light Repair  
Inverurie Works 07/04/1945 05/05/1945 29 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 27/04/1946 28/05/1946 32 days Heavy  
Cowlairs Works 21/04/1947 25/06/1947 66 days General
Boiler number 2636 (Diagram 97)
 
Inverurie Works 02/03/1948 04/03/1948 3 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 13/10/1950 04/11/1950 23 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64795
 
Cowlairs Works 02/03/1954 27/03/1954 26 days General
Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 05/03/1957 06/04/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 27543 (Diagram 97)
 
Inverurie Works 04/11/1957 06/11/1957 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 26/02/1959 1 day Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 25/06/1959 30/06/1959 6 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 23/01/1961 17/03/1961 54 days Heavy Intermediate
A.W.S. fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 Cowlairs Works The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. SLS/194702
02/08/1962 Polmont MPD In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/07/1929 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2742
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
17/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1719 (Diagram 97)
   
01/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97)
   
11/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1936.    
04/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1936.    
27/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1937.    
17/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97)
   
01/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/07/1939.    
07/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940.    
26/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1943.    
20/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/08/1943.    
11/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1943.    
07/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945.    
27/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 28/05/1946.    
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4795    
21/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1947. Dep: 25/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2636 (Diagram 97)
   
02/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/03/1948. Dep: 04/03/1948.    
13/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64795
   
02/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97)
   
05/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27543 (Diagram 97)
   
04/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 06/11/1957.    
26/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1959.    
10/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
25/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 30/06/1959.    
23/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1961. Dep: 17/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
A.W.S. fitted
   
22/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64795 from Dunfermline Upper (62C)    

prev prev