|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/02/1932 | 26/03/1932 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1935 | 18/04/1935 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1937 | 24/07/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1939 | 18/11/1939 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1942 | 19/02/1942 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 8584 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/04/1944 | 03/06/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 09/12/1945 | 06/02/1946 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1948 | 25/03/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64797 |
||
Derby Works | 28/05/1950 | 24/08/1950 | 89 days | General | |||
Derby Works | 28/08/1950 | 04/09/1950 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 31/05/1953 | 01/08/1953 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 27786 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 04/05/1954 | 01/06/1954 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 21/07/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 15/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 35 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27775 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/06/1950 | Derby Works | Engines into works: 60, 40063, 656, 41043, 41064, 1341, 41535, 41904, 42340, 42377, 43203, 43310, 3511, 4179, 44241, 44555, 58070, 64784, 64841, 64797, 64903 and pannier tank 2070. A number of J.39's are now shopped at Derby. Ex works in lined black with emblem 40007, 40409, 40586, 41117: un-lined ditto 47292, 47305, 47432, 43521, 43960, 44136, 43657, 12024, 2182 (pannier tank), 41779 (retaining R.T. Firebox and Salter safety-valves), still lettered L.M.S. 40700, 41078, 43978, 58240 (retaining round-topped firebox and Salter safety-valves). Cut up between 31/5/50 and 16/6/50: 40516, 2096 (Tilbury Tank), 3805 (3F). New Construction: Ulster Transport Authority Nos. 54 and 55 completed; 56 boiler fitted; 57 frames only. B.R. 42145 completed; 42146 frames only; 12069/70 ex works. Running trials: 10800 0-4-4-0 Diesel, N.B. Loco. Co. 26413/50; Davey-Paxman Diesel engine, electrical equipment by B.T.H. Co. | SLS/195008 |
31/08/1950 | Derby Works | For works: 12000, 40012/51/8, 40353, 414, 40498, 40515, 527, 40567, 684, 40917/26/8, 41017/58/72/7/81, 41124/60/9, 41710, 1748, 41961, 42508/15, 3099, 43216/24, 3271, 43283, 3484, 43538, 3738/59/60, 43835/54/62, 43909/16/29/94, 44020/45/94/6, 44137, 44414/33/75, 44566, 47220, 7237, 47287, 7324, 47356, 7395, 7403/5/17/51, 47506, 7507,7542/81, 58033, 1406, 58080, 58224, W.2108 and 'J.39' 4721/37/85, 64980, 4956. Ex Works: 42146, UTA.57, 12070-3 (new): and after repair 40410, 40535/56, 40929, 41088, 41535, 41672, 41752, 41889, 42353, 42510, 43224, 43446, 43574, 43690, 44127/37/90, 44242, 44362, 44414/72, 44521, 47280, 47342/56/65, 47426, 47526, 58220/4/9, 64762/84/97, 64960 and 2097. New Construction, in various stages 2-6-4T 42050-4 (Order 4310) and D/E 12074/5 almost complete. Being cut up 41034, 58036 (24/8). The works yard contained 22853, 43818, 43297, 41017, 3511, 40515 (all condemned) and 58033, 1406, 40498 (under consideration). | SLS/195012 |
15/09/1950 | Derby Works | For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E. New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station. Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted). |
SLS/195012 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2771 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1468 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
07/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
29/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1932. Dep: 26/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
01/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1935. Dep: 18/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
03/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1942. Dep: 19/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8584 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
29/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
23/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
09/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1945. Dep: 06/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
19/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4797 | ||
15/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1948. Dep: 25/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64797 |
||
28/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1950. Dep: 24/08/1950. | ||
28/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1950. Dep: 04/09/1950. | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
10/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
28/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
28/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
31/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1953. Dep: 01/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27786 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1954. Dep: 01/06/1954. | ||
21/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. | ||
15/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27775 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
28/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64797 from Lowestoft (32C) | ||
10/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |