Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 567 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6376 Week
» 13560 Month
» 321541 Year
» 1205922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2772   11/09/1929
LNER (1946) 4798   31/10/1946
BR 64798   04/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 11/09/1929 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 33 yrs , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 11/09/1929
IPS Ipswich 18/09/1929
STR Stratford 09/05/1932
PKS Parkeston Quay 21/08/1938
STR Stratford 26/03/1939
MAR March 20/10/1939
STR Stratford 28/05/1943
NOR Norwich Thorpe 13/09/1944
YAR Yarmouth South Town 09/10/1946
NOR Norwich Thorpe 10/12/1946
YAR Yarmouth South Town 12/10/1947
NOR Norwich Thorpe 12/11/1947
38E Woodford Halse 16/04/1950
38A Colwick 08/10/1950
38B Annesley 03/11/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 12/10/1946
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 10/12/1946
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 16/04/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 30/11/1957
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/09/1929 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2273)
09/04/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2193)
18/10/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2203)
19/12/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8016)
11/02/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2184)
22/01/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1355)
28/08/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2317)
04/12/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8592)
10/11/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2309)
16/05/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27755)
22/11/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27837)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/03/1932 09/04/1932 27 days General
Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1934 18/10/1934 16 days General
Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1936 19/12/1936 24 days General
Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1939 11/02/1939 30 days General
Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1940 16/03/1940 70 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/06/1941 14/08/1941 68 days General  
Stratford Works 05/12/1943 22/01/1944 49 days General
Boiler number E1355 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 13/07/1945 20/08/1945 39 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 21/04/1946 28/08/1946 130 days General
Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 01/06/1947 29/07/1947 59 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 03/10/1948 04/12/1948 63 days General
Boiler number 8592 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64798
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1949 23/04/1949 79 days Heavy Casual  
Derby Works 29/08/1950 10/11/1950 74 days General
Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1953 16/05/1953 40 days General
Boiler number 27755 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1956 24/03/1956 39 days General
Boiler number 4988 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1958 22/11/1958 34 days General
Boiler number 27837 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/09/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 2772
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
18/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
14/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1932. Dep: 09/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97)
   
09/05/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
03/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1934. Dep: 18/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97)
   
26/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97)
   
21/08/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
13/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97)
   
26/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
20/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
07/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940.    
08/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1941. Dep: 14/08/1941.    
28/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
05/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E1355 (Diagram 97)
   
13/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
13/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1945. Dep: 20/08/1945.    
21/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1946. Dep: 28/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97)
   
09/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
31/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4798    
10/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
01/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/06/1947. Dep: 29/07/1947.    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
12/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
03/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8592 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64798
   
04/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949.    
16/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
29/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1950. Dep: 10/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97)
   
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
07/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27755 (Diagram 97)
   
15/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1956. Dep: 24/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4988 (Diagram 97)
   
03/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
20/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1958. Dep: 22/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27837 (Diagram 97)
   
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64798 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev