|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/11/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 8019 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2277 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1936 | 01/08/1936 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 8581 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2146 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1941 | 18/08/1941 | 65 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 2683 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1947 | 30/08/1947 | 217 days | General | Boiler number 2771 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 22/04/1951 | 29/06/1951 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 27670 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64801 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1954 | 28/04/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 25810 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1954 | 06/05/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1955 | 12/03/1955 | 38 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1955 | 05/04/1955 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1956 | 24/11/1956 | 52 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27791 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1959 | 28/04/1959 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1959 | 04/06/1959 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1960 | 05/07/1960 | 37 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/05/1951 | Derby Works | On 5th May, 73002 was complete in Works, 73003 almost finished, 73004 boiler in position, 73005 frames only. By 22nd May, 73004 complete, 73005/6 frames only. Diesels, on the same date, were 12088 complete, 12089 almost so, 12090/1 frames only. In works yard were 40470, 41006. Other regions' engines in works were : 64744 (39A), 64796, 64801 (37A), 64887 (40A) and 0-6-0PT 2088. | SLS/195107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/09/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2775 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1472 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
04/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8019 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2277 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8581 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2146 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
15/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1941. Dep: 18/08/1941. | ||
03/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
30/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
18/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2683 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4801 | ||
26/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2771 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1951. Dep: 29/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27670 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64801 |
||
18/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1954. Dep: 28/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25810 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/05/1954. Dep: 06/05/1954. | ||
03/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/02/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955. | ||
20/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1955. Dep: 05/04/1955. | ||
27/05/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) | ||
04/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/10/1956. Dep: 24/11/1956. | ||
31/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27791 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
15/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/04/1959. Dep: 28/04/1959. | ||
21/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/05/1959. Dep: 04/06/1959. | ||
30/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 05/07/1960. | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64801 from Low Moor (56F) | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |