|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/11/1931 | 12/12/1931 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1934 | 28/07/1934 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 8581 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1938 | 30/08/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1940 | 18/01/1941 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/08/1943 | 28/09/1943 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2665 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1947 | 29/02/1948 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 2678 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4803 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1950 | 03/06/1950 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 4987 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64803 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1950 | 15/06/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1950 | 31/07/1950 | 42 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 24/03/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27775 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/10/1955 | 01/12/1955 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27666 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/05/1956 | 01/06/1956 | 32 days | Light Casual | Not repaired |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. | SLS/194805 |
21/10/1948 | Swindon Stock Shed (Newburn Wagon Repair) | On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/10/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2777 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1474 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
21/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
18/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend on Sea (?) | ||
25/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
01/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend on Sea (?) | ||
08/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
10/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8581 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1938. Dep: 30/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
03/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1943. Dep: 28/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2665 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
14/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4803 | ||
16/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1947. Dep: 29/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2678 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4803 |
||
26/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1950. Dep: 03/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4987 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64803 |
||
09/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1950. Dep: 15/06/1950. | ||
20/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 31/07/1950. | ||
14/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
24/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27775 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
16/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1955. Dep: 01/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27666 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/05/1956. Dep: 01/06/1956. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
28/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64803 from Cambridge (31A) | ||
10/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |