Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2777   16/10/1929
LNER (1946) 4803   01/12/1946
BR (Tmp) E4803   29/02/1948
BR 64803   03/06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 16/10/1929 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 28/09/1959 off Cambridge (31A)
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 29 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 16/10/1929
STR Stratford 21/10/1929
? Southend on Sea 18/01/1930
STR Stratford 25/01/1930
? Southend on Sea 01/02/1930
STR Stratford 08/02/1930
COL Colchester 25/09/1939
STR Stratford 03/12/1939
NOR Norwich Thorpe 22/09/1944
IPS Ipswich 29/07/1946
30A Stratford 14/10/1951
31A Cambridge 15/05/1955
   Withdrawn 28/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/05/1955
WDN   28/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/10/1929 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2287)
12/12/1931 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2282)
28/07/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8581)
16/05/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8009)
30/08/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number RS118)
18/01/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2216)
28/09/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2665)
16/06/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2193)
29/02/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2678)
03/06/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4987)
16/05/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27775)
01/12/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27666)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 10/11/1931 12/12/1931 33 days General
Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1934 28/07/1934 16 days General
Boiler number 8581 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1936 16/05/1936 19 days General
Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1938 30/08/1938 29 days General
Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1940 18/01/1941 53 days General
Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 08/08/1943 28/09/1943 52 days General
Boiler number 2665 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1945 16/06/1945 64 days General
Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1947 29/02/1948 76 days General
Boiler number 2678 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E4803
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1950 03/06/1950 70 days General
Boiler number 4987 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64803
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1950 15/06/1950 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/06/1950 31/07/1950 42 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 24/03/1953 16/05/1953 54 days General
Boiler number 27775 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 16/10/1955 01/12/1955 47 days General
Boiler number 27666 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 01/05/1956 01/06/1956 32 days Light Casual
Not repaired
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/10/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 2777
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
21/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
18/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Southend on Sea (?)    
25/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
01/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Southend on Sea (?)    
08/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
10/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97)
   
13/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8581 (Diagram 97)
   
28/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97)
   
02/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1938. Dep: 30/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97)
   
25/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
03/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
27/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97)
   
08/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1943. Dep: 28/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2665 (Diagram 97)
   
22/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
14/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97)
   
29/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4803    
16/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1947. Dep: 29/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2678 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E4803
   
26/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1950. Dep: 03/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4987 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64803
   
09/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1950. Dep: 15/06/1950.    
20/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 31/07/1950.    
14/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27775 (Diagram 97)
   
15/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
16/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1955. Dep: 01/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27666 (Diagram 97)
   
01/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/05/1956. Dep: 01/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
   
28/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64803 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev