|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/11/1931 | 12/12/1931 | 33 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1934 | 30/06/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8017 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 31/07/1934 | 01/08/1934 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1936 | 03/10/1936 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2189 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1939 | 04/03/1939 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2194 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1941 | 16/08/1941 | 50 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 18/03/1942 | 23/07/1942 | 128 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 08/09/1943 | 19/10/1943 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 27/06/1944 | 25/08/1944 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 2704 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 02/03/1947 | 04/06/1947 | 95 days | General | Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 4920 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64804 |
||
Derby Works | 29/09/1951 | 30/10/1951 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 08/12/1953 | 05/02/1954 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27671 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27887 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/10/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2778 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1475 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
28/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
10/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931. | ||
09/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8017 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1934. Dep: 01/08/1934. | ||
04/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2189 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1939. Dep: 04/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2194 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941. | ||
18/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1942. Dep: 23/07/1942. | ||
08/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1943. Dep: 19/10/1943. | ||
13/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
27/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1944. Dep: 25/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2704 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4804 | ||
02/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1947. Dep: 04/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4920 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64804 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
29/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/09/1951. Dep: 30/10/1951. | ||
08/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1953. Dep: 05/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27671 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27887 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
26/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
07/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
13/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
04/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
19/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64804 from Colwick (40E) |