Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 137 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7878 Week
» 28320 Month
» 365166 Year
» 1586731 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2781 on 07/11/1929
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4807   24/10/1946
British Railways 64807   11/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 07/11/1929 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Tue 05/04/1960 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping During 04/1960
Service Life 30 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 07/11/1929
CLK Colwick on 15/11/1929
ANN Annesley on 19/11/1929
CLK Colwick on 09/08/1943
GOR Gorton on 03/10/1943
38A Colwick on 14/05/1950
40D Tuxford on 27/09/1953
30A Stratford on 16/01/1955
41A Sheffield Darnall on 07/12/1958
   Withdrawn on 05/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 27/12/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   on 05/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/11/1929 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2296)
11/11/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8024)
08/02/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8004)
26/12/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2290)
26/03/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2301)
28/10/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2579)
07/10/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2208)
08/02/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3170)
11/12/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2103)
19/09/1952 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27719)
04/11/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27848)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/10/1932 11/11/1932 26 days General
Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1935 08/02/1935 19 days General
Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1936 26/12/1936 20 days General
Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1938 26/03/1938 26 days General
Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1939 28/10/1939 78 days General
Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 17/12/1941 29/03/1942 103 days General  
Gorton Works 01/12/1942 17/04/1943 138 days General  
Gorton Works 06/08/1944 07/10/1944 63 days General
Boiler number 2208 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1946 08/02/1947 174 days General
Boiler number 3170 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4807
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1947 15/03/1947 6 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 30/09/1948 11/12/1948 73 days General
Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64807
 
Gorton Works 12/07/1949 19/08/1949 39 days Light Casual  
Derby Works 18/09/1950 23/11/1950 67 days Heavy Intermediate  
Derby Works 30/07/1952 19/09/1952 52 days General
Boiler number 27719 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 20/07/1954 27/08/1954 39 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 29/09/1955 04/11/1955 37 days General
Boiler number 27848 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 04/11/1957 10/01/1958 68 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 7/10/50:-50 1A, 40332 5A, 40478 16A, 41165 2A, 41181 9E, 1186 26C, 41187 27A, 41686 16A, 42362 9A, 42395 11B, 43795 18A, 43992 18B, 44175 22B, 44400 20E, 7674 6C, 53803 22C, 58059 15D, (6)4782 30A, 64807 38A. Ex Works: 41050, 43435, 64737, 43456, 44180, 58090, 58237. SLS/195012
30/11/1950 Derby Works In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed.
Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal.
SLS/195101

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/11/1929 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2781
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
15/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
19/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
17/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1932. Dep: 11/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97)
   
21/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1935. Dep: 08/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97)
   
07/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97)
   
01/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97)
   
12/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 28/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97)
   
17/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1941. Dep: 29/03/1942.    
01/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1942. Dep: 17/04/1943.    
09/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
03/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2208 (Diagram 97)
   
19/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1946. Dep: 08/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3170 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4807
   
10/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/03/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947.    
30/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1948. Dep: 11/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64807
   
12/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/07/1949. Dep: 19/08/1949.    
14/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
18/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/09/1950. Dep: 23/11/1950.    
30/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1952. Dep: 19/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27719 (Diagram 97)
   
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
20/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/07/1954. Dep: 27/08/1954.    
16/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
29/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1955. Dep: 04/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27848 (Diagram 97)
   
04/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 10/01/1958.    
07/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
05/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64807 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev