Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 208 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 208 Week
» 22714 Month
» 325904 Year
» 1547469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2782 on 12/11/1929
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4808   09/06/1946
British Railways 64808   21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 12/11/1929 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Tue 21/02/1961 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping During 03/1961
Service Life 31 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 12/11/1929
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 16/11/1929
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 16/12/1937
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 29/07/1938
   Withdrawn on 21/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   on 21/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/02/1904 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1351)
12/11/1929 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2299)
21/04/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8013)
23/07/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8772)
18/01/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2683)
07/04/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3177)
21/08/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4942)
12/12/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27665)
01/09/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 25809)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/02/1932 05/03/1932 27 days General  
Gorton Works 29/03/1934 21/04/1934 24 days General
Boiler number 8013 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 07/04/1936 16/05/1936 40 days General  
Gorton Works 28/06/1938 23/07/1938 26 days General
Boiler number 8772 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1940 18/01/1941 44 days General
Boiler number 2683 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1943 05/02/1944 67 days General  
Gorton Works 25/03/1945 16/06/1945 84 days General  
Gorton Works 07/10/1946 07/04/1947 183 days General
Boiler number 3177 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1948 21/08/1948 14 days General
Boiler number 4942 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64808
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1948 02/10/1948 28 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 28/06/1951 23/08/1951 57 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 06/11/1953 12/12/1953 37 days General
Boiler number 27665 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1953 19/12/1953 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/07/1956 01/09/1956 63 days General
Boiler number 25809 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/04/1946 Market Harborough On 6/4/46 the three parts of the 12 noon ex St. Pancras were hauled by 5279 (14B); 5259 (10C); and 5715 (12A), respectively. In the up direction, the 2.40 p.m. ex Leicester was behind 4808 (5A), whilst of the two portions of the 4.50 p.m. ex Leicester (nominally a 19G duty) were worked by 5105 (26A), and 4815 (17A). SLS/194605
30/03/1946 Crewe/Horwich - Class 5 builds Further class 5 4-6-0 will be built during 1946 a follows: 4932-66/82-96 or Horwich, 4967-81 at Crewe. SLS/194605
28/06/1951 Derby Works New class 5MT complete up to 73007, 73008 almost finished. 73009 frames and cylinders, 73010/1 frames only. In works for special examination were 40444, 41005 and (4)1856. Other interesting locos were 43218 (71H), 43787 (8B), 47337 (12E), 22912 (11B), 64808 (39B), 64724 (9G), 64750 (38A). SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/02/1904 Modification Diagram 97 number E1351 boiler fitted    
12/11/1929 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2782
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
16/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
08/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932.    
29/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8013 (Diagram 97)
   
07/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936.    
16/12/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
28/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8772 (Diagram 97)
   
29/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
06/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2683 (Diagram 97)
   
01/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1943. Dep: 05/02/1944.    
25/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945.    
09/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4808    
07/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1946. Dep: 07/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3177 (Diagram 97)
   
08/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4942 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64808
   
05/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/09/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948.    
28/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/06/1951. Dep: 23/08/1951.    
06/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27665 (Diagram 97)
   
15/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953.    
01/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 25809 (Diagram 97)
   
21/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64808 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev