Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1098 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7488 Week
» 36986 Month
» 373832 Year
» 1595397 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2783 on 18/11/1929
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4809   06/10/1946
British Railways 64809   24/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 18/11/1929 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/01/1962 off Woodford Halse (2F)
Scrapping During 02/1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 18/11/1929
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 21/11/1929
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 14/04/1936
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 06/07/1936
YK York (North) on 19/06/1938
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 12/08/1938
39A Gorton on 27/10/1957
2F Woodford Halse on 01/06/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 27/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 02/11/1957
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 5w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   w/e 27/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/11/1929 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2300)
15/03/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2301)
25/01/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2214)
26/04/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2290)
04/05/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2301)
15/01/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2203)
16/04/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2287)
24/12/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4981)
22/01/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27764)
26/10/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27839)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/10/1931 05/12/1931 38 days General  
Gorton Works 20/02/1934 15/03/1934 24 days General
Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 17/12/1935 25/01/1936 40 days General
Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1938 26/04/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1940 04/05/1940 44 days General
Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1943 15/01/1944 69 days General
Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1944 09/02/1944 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 07/10/1946 16/04/1947 192 days General
Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1947 16/05/1947 19 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 28/10/1949 24/12/1949 58 days General
Boiler number 27702 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64809
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1949 30/12/1949 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 02/01/1950 21/01/1950 20 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 24/10/1952 27/11/1952 35 days Hfl  
Gorton Works 18/12/1954 22/01/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 27764 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1957 26/10/1957 29 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 27839 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/11/1929 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2783
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
21/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
29/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931.    
20/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1934. Dep: 15/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97)
   
17/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1935. Dep: 25/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97)
   
14/04/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
06/07/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
29/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1938. Dep: 26/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97)
   
19/06/1938 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
12/08/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
22/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97)
   
08/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97)
   
02/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1944. Dep: 09/02/1944.    
06/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4809    
07/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1946. Dep: 16/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97)
   
28/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1947. Dep: 16/05/1947.    
28/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27702 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64809
   
29/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1949. Dep: 30/12/1949.    
02/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 21/01/1950.    
24/10/1952 Works Visit      
18/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27764 (Diagram 97)
   
28/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
Boiler number 27839 (Diagram 97)
   
27/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
01/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
27/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64809 from Woodford Halse (2F)    

prev prev